ResMan, LLC v. Karya Property Management, LLC et al
Plaintiff: ResMan, LLC
Defendant: Karya Property Management, LLC and Scarlet InfoTech, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00402
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:1030
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 52 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by ResMan, LLC for proceedings held on 07/01/2019 before Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. (Jackson, John) (Transcript request emailed to Lori Barnett, court reporter, on 08/02/2019) (hma).
July 29, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Karya Property Management, LLC, Scarlet InfoTech, Inc. (Richardson, Michael)
July 29, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by ResMan, LLC (Jackson, John)
July 23, 2019 Filing 49 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #37 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Computer Fraud and Abuse Act Claims filed by ResMan, LLC. (Jackson, John)
July 16, 2019 Filing 48 RESPONSE in Support re #37 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Computer Fraud and Abuse Act Claims filed by Karya Property Management, LLC, Scarlet InfoTech, Inc.. (Richardson, Michael)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/4/2020 at 09:00 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Amended Pleadings due by 2/14/2020. Discovery due by 4/24/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 9/13/2019. Jury instructions due by 8/14/2020. Mediation Completion due by 10/25/2019. Designation of Mediator due by 9/13/2019, Motions due by 5/8/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/31/2020. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 7/16/2019. (rpc, )
July 9, 2019 Filing 46 RESPONSE in Opposition re #37 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Computer Fraud and Abuse Act Claims filed by ResMan, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jackson, John)
July 9, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE OF JOINT SUBMISSION IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF AGREED SCHEDULING ORDER by ResMan, LLC . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Scheduling Order)(Jackson, John)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 7/5/2019. (rpc, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE by ResMan, LLC of Joint Submission in Support of Proposed Preliminary Injunction Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Proposed Preliminary Injunction Order, #2 Exhibit B - Defendants' Proposed Preliminary Injunction Order)(Jackson, John)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER DENYING as moot #6 Motion to Expedite. Parties are advised at hearing that discovery is open. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 07/01/2019. (kkc, )
July 1, 2019 Filing 42 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III: Motion Hearing held on 7/1/2019 at 1:31 p.m. re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Supporting Memorandum filed by ResMan, LLC, #6 MOTION to Expedite Discovery and Supporting Memorandum filed by ResMan, LLC. Court adjourned at 2:51 p.m. (Court Reporter Lori Barnett.) (kkc, )
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER denying as moot #9 Motion for Accelerated Briefing and Hearing on its Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 6/28/2019. (rpc, )
June 26, 2019 Filing 40 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Supporting Memorandum filed by Karya Property Management, LLC, Scarlet InfoTech, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Ltr regarding ResMan software, #2 Exhibit 2 - Nitya Capital Webpage)(Golub, Jeffrey)
June 26, 2019 Filing 39 RESPONSE in Support re #26 Unopposed MOTION to Expedite (Accelerated Briefing on Alternative Cross-motion for Expedited Discovery) filed by Karya Property Management, LLC, Scarlet InfoTech, Inc.. (Golub, Jeffrey)
June 26, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Preston Bruno on behalf of ResMan, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7325873. (Bruno, Preston)
June 25, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Computer Fraud and Abuse Act Claims by Karya Property Management, LLC, Scarlet InfoTech, Inc.. (Richardson, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/26/2019: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (rpc, ).
June 24, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert L Sayles on behalf of Karya Property Management, LLC, Scarlet InfoTech, Inc. (Sayles, Robert)
June 24, 2019 Filing 35 RESPONSE to #20 Response to Motion,,, Defendants' Cross-Motion for Reciprocal Expedited Discovery filed by ResMan, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - R. Shames email, #2 Exhibit 2 - J. Golub email, #3 Exhibit 3 - Email exchange, #4 Errata 4 - Email exchange, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Jackson, John)
June 24, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard Alan Sayles on behalf of Karya Property Management, LLC, Scarlet InfoTech, Inc. (Sayles, Richard)
June 21, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott Masur McElhaney on behalf of ResMan, LLC (McElhaney, Scott)
June 20, 2019 Filing 32 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Supporting Memorandum filed by ResMan, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nicolas Khoury, #2 Exhibit 1 - to the Reply ISO Motion for TRO (Shetty LinkedIn))(Jackson, John)
June 20, 2019 ***FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY - ATTORNEY TO REFILE (PER PHONE CALL). Document # 31, REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (baf, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 31 ***PLEASE DISREGARD - FILED IN ERROR***REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Supporting Memorandum filed by ResMan, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nicolas Khoury, #2 Exhibit 1 - to Declaration of Nicolas Khoury)(Jackson, John) Modified on 6/20/2019 (baf, ).
June 19, 2019 Filing 30 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Scarlet InfoTech, Inc. (Richardson, Michael)
June 19, 2019 Filing 29 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Karya Property Management, LLC, Scarlet InfoTech, Inc. (Richardson, Michael)
June 19, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Seepan Vartan Parseghian on behalf of Karya Property Management, LLC, Scarlet InfoTech, Inc. (Parseghian, Seepan)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Accelerated Briefing on Their Alternative Cross-Motion for Expedited Discovery. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 6/19/2019. (rpc, )
June 18, 2019 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION to Expedite (Accelerated Briefing on Alternative Cross-motion for Expedited Discovery) by Karya Property Management, LLC, Scarlet InfoTech, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Accelerated Briefing on their Alternative Cross-motion for Expedited Discovery)(Richardson, Michael)
June 18, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE by Karya Property Management, LLC, Scarlet InfoTech, Inc. re #20 Response to Motion,,, (Richardson, Michael)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 6/17/2019. (rpc, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Expedite Discovery and Supporting Memorandum filed by ResMan, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Cited link at time of filing Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Cited Link at present time)(Jackson, John)
June 14, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Supporting Memorandum filed by Karya Property Management, LLC, Scarlet InfoTech, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - Declaration of Ashwin Shetty, #2 Exhibit Ex B - Defendants Offer Letter, #3 Exhibit Ex C - Plaintiffs Rejection Letter, #4 Text of Proposed Order Order Denying Plaintiff Resman, LLC's Expedited Motion for Temporary Restraining Order)(Golub, Jeffrey)
June 14, 2019 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order by ResMan, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Agreed Protective Order)(Jackson, John)
June 11, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Expedite Discovery and Supporting Memorandum filed by Karya Property Management, LLC, Scarlet InfoTech, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 -2019 Ltr re Defendants Offer, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - RFP's to Karya, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 -RFP's to Expedien, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4 -Interrogatories to Karya, #5 Exhibit Ex. 5 - Interrogatories to Expedien, #6 Exhibit Ex. 6 -Top Property Management Software 2019 Reviews, #7 Exhibit Ex. 7 -2019 Ltr re ResMan Rejection Defendants, #8 Exhibit Ex. 8 - 2019 Ltr re ResMan Opposition to Reciprocal Discovery, #9 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Denying Motion for Expedited Discovery, #10 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Cross-Motion for Expedited Discovery)(Golub, Jeffrey)
June 11, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE by ResMan, LLC re #6 MOTION to Expedite Discovery and Supporting Memorandum Amended Certificate of Conference (Jackson, John)
June 11, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE by ResMan, LLC re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Supporting Memorandum Amended Certificate of Conference (Jackson, John)
June 7, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Mark Golub on behalf of Karya Property Management, LLC, Scarlet InfoTech, Inc. (Golub, Jeffrey)
June 7, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Ernest Richardson on behalf of Karya Property Management, LLC, Scarlet InfoTech, Inc. (Richardson, Michael)
June 5, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ResMan, LLC. Scarlet InfoTech, Inc. served on 6/5/2019, answer due 6/26/2019. (Jackson, John)
June 5, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ResMan, LLC. Karya Property Management, LLC served on 6/4/2019, answer due 6/25/2019. (Jackson, John)
June 4, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Robert Shames on behalf of ResMan, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7296161. (Shames, Robert)
June 4, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by G. Mark Edgarton on behalf of ResMan, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7296157. (Edgarton, G.)
June 4, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Daniel C. Winston on behalf of ResMan, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7296148. (Winston, Daniel)
June 4, 2019 Counsel are reminded that the Court has not opted out of this court's Local Rules concerning courtesy copies; therefore, Counsel are asked to comply with Local Rule CV-5(a)(9) and Local Rule CV-10(b) with respect to sending courtesy copies to Judge Mazzant. Please send copies of pleadings that exceed 20 pages to Judge Mazzant's chambers. Please use tabs and dividers for exhibits. (tls)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Supporting Memorandum. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file a response to the motion within ten (10) days of the date of this Order. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff's Expedited Motion For Temporary Restraining Order (Dkt. #5 ) is set for Evidentiary Hearing on Monday, July 1, 2019, at 1:30 p.m.. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 6/4/2019. (rpc, )
June 4, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Accelerated Briefing and Hearing on its Motion for Temporary Restraining Order re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Supporting Memorandum by ResMan, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jackson, John)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Expedited Discovery. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 6/4/2019. (rpc, )
June 3, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Accelerated Briefing on its Motion for Expedited Discovery re #6 MOTION to Expedite Discovery and Supporting Memorandum by ResMan, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jackson, John)
June 3, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Expedite Discovery and Supporting Memorandum by ResMan, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jackson, John)
June 3, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Supporting Memorandum by ResMan, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Jackson, John)
June 3, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to Scarlet InfoTech, Inc. (rpc, )
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Karya Property Management, LLC. (rpc, )
June 3, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
June 3, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, )
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by ResMan, LLC identifying Corporate Parent ResMan Holdings, LLC for ResMan, LLC. (Jackson, John)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Karya Property Management, LLC, Scarlet InfoTech, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7293514.), filed by ResMan, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Master Subscription Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Purchase Orders, #3 Exhibit 3 - Terms and Conditions, #4 Exhibit 4 - Letter to Karya Property Management, #5 Exhibit 5 - Application for Certificate of Authority, #6 Exhibit 6 - Assumed Name Certificate, #7 Exhibit 7 - Scarlet Infotech PIR Report, #8 Exhibit 8 - FEC Forms, #9 Exhibit 9 - Excerpts from ERP Business Analyst, #10 Exhibit 10 - Code Excerpt, #11 Exhibit 11 - Agarwal LinkedIn, #12 Exhibit 12 - Varshney LinkedIn, #13 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jackson, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ResMan, LLC v. Karya Property Management, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karya Property Management, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Mark Golub
Represented By: Seepan Vartan Parseghian
Represented By: Robert L Sayles
Represented By: Michael Ernest Richardson
Represented By: Richard Alan Sayles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scarlet InfoTech, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Mark Golub
Represented By: Seepan Vartan Parseghian
Represented By: Robert L Sayles
Represented By: Michael Ernest Richardson
Represented By: Richard Alan Sayles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ResMan, LLC
Represented By: John M Jackson
Represented By: G. Mark Edgarton
Represented By: Robert Shames
Represented By: Daniel C. Winston
Represented By: Preston Bruno
Represented By: Scott Masur McElhaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?