Rich v. Columbia Medical Center of Plano Subsidiary, L.P.
Plaintiff: Angelia M Rich and Angela Marie Rich
Defendant: COLUMBIA MEDICAL CENTER OF PLANO SUBSIDIARY, L.P. FORMERLY D/B/A MEDICAL CENTER OF PLANO AND CURRENTLY D/B/A MEDICAL CITY PLANO and Columbia Medical Center of Plano Subsidiary, L.P.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00404
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26(f) attorney conference on or before: August 6, 2019. File joint report of attorney conference: August 20, 2019. The case is SET for a Rule 16 management conference on Tuesday, September 3, 2019, at 2:30 p.m. at the Paul Brown United States Courthouse, 101 E. Pecan Street, Sherman, Texas 75090. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 7/16/2019. (daj, )
July 1, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Columbia Medical Center of Plano Subsidiary, L.P..(Patterson, Nancy)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Angela Marie Rich. Columbia Medical Center of Plano Subsidiary, L.P. served on 6/10/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. (Wall, John)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Columbia Medical Center of Plano Subsidiary, L.P. (rpc, )
June 4, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
June 3, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, )
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against COLUMBIA MEDICAL CENTER OF PLANO SUBSIDIARY, L.P. FORMERLY D/B/A MEDICAL CENTER OF PLANO AND CURRENTLY D/B/A MEDICAL CITY PLANO ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7293819.), filed by Angelia M Rich. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wall, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rich v. Columbia Medical Center of Plano Subsidiary, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelia M Rich
Represented By: John Edward Wall, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Marie Rich
Represented By: John Edward Wall, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLUMBIA MEDICAL CENTER OF PLANO SUBSIDIARY, L.P. FORMERLY D/B/A MEDICAL CENTER OF PLANO AND CURRENTLY D/B/A MEDICAL CITY PLANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia Medical Center of Plano Subsidiary, L.P.
Represented By: Nancy Lynne Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?