Horne et al v. Texas Department of Transportation
Plaintiff: Victor Carrell, Robert A. Horne and Eric Richards
Defendant: Texas Department of Transportation
Case Number: 4:2019cv00405
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 Opposed MOTION for Hearing re #6 Response in Opposition to Motion, #5 Opposed MOTION to Sever filed by Victor Carrell, Robert A. Horne, Eric Richards. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Notzon, Robert)
July 24, 2019 Filing 8 Opposed MOTION for Hearing re #6 Response in Opposition to Motion, #5 Opposed MOTION to Sever by Texas Department of Transportation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Owens, Amy) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/25/2019) (baf, ).
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 9/10/2019 at 10:30 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Rule 26 Meeting Joint Report due by 8/26/2019. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 7/22/2019. (baf, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 Opposed MOTION to Sever filed by Victor Carrell, Robert A. Horne, Eric Richards. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Notzon, Robert)
July 1, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 Opposed MOTION to Sever by Texas Department of Transportation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Owens, Amy) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/1/2019) (baf, ).
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Texas Department of Transportation.(Owens, Amy)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert A. Horne, Victor Carrell, Eric Richards. Texas Department of Transportation served on 6/10/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. (Notzon, Robert)
June 4, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Texas Department of Transportation. (baf, )
June 3, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
June 3, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (baf, )
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Texas Department of Transportation ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7293876.), filed by Robert A. Horne, Victor Carrell, Eric Richards. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A) (Notzon, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Horne et al v. Texas Department of Transportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Carrell
Represented By: Robert Stephen Notzon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert A. Horne
Represented By: Robert Stephen Notzon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Richards
Represented By: Robert Stephen Notzon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Department of Transportation
Represented By: Amy Kovar Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?