Berry v. Texas Woman's University et al
Plaintiff: D'Andre F Berry
Defendant: Texas Woman's University, William Patten, Rob Ramirez, Ward Sheeder, Anthony Yardley, Lewis Benavides, Jason Tomlinson and Texas Office of the Attorney General
Case Number: 4:2019cv00409
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Christine A Nowak
Referring Judge: Robert W Schroeder
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by D'Andre F Berry. Anthony Yardley waiver sent on 6/19/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Wigginton, Kenneth)
June 27, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by D'Andre F Berry. Jason Tomlinson waiver sent on 6/19/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Wigginton, Kenneth)
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by D'Andre F Berry. Ward Sheeder waiver sent on 6/19/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Wigginton, Kenneth)
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by D'Andre F Berry. Rob Ramirez waiver sent on 6/19/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Wigginton, Kenneth)
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by D'Andre F Berry. William Patten waiver sent on 6/19/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Wigginton, Kenneth)
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by D'Andre F Berry. Lewis Benavides waiver sent on 6/19/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Wigginton, Kenneth)
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by D'Andre F Berry. Texas Office of the Attorney General waiver sent on 6/19/2019, answer due 8/19/2019; Texas Woman's University waiver sent on 6/19/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Wigginton, Kenneth)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by D'Andre F Berry. Texas Office of the Attorney General waiver sent on 6/4/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Wigginton, Kenneth)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to file a notice that the case is ready for a scheduling conference when all Defendants have either answered or filed a motion to transfer or dismiss. The notice must be filed within five days of the last remaining Defendant's answer or motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 6/14/2019. (baf, )
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. The Court REFERS the above-styled and numbered civil action to United States Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak to conduct all pretrial proceedings in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 6/4/2019. (baf, )
June 4, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
June 4, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. (baf, )
June 4, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7295049.), filed by D'Andre F Berry. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wigginton, Kenneth)
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Kenneth Wayne Wigginton on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7294974. (Wigginton, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berry v. Texas Woman's University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Woman's University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Patten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ward Sheeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Yardley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lewis Benavides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Tomlinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Office of the Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D'Andre F Berry
Represented By: Kenneth Wayne Wigginton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?