Women's Elevated Sober Living LLC et al v. City of Plano, Texas
Plaintiff: Constance Swanston, Women's Elevated Sober Living LLC and Shannon Jones
Defendant: City of Plano, Texas
Case Number: 4:2019cv00412
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Women's Elevated Sober Living LLC, Constance Swanston, Shannon Jones. City of Plano, Texas waiver sent on 6/24/2019, answer due 8/23/2019. (Hunt, Richard)
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Patrick McGreal on behalf of Shannon Jones (McGreal, Christopher)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rachel Beth Cohen-Miller on behalf of Shannon Jones (Cohen-Miller, Rachel)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT against City of Plano, Texas, filed by Shannon Jones.(Cohen-Miller, Rachel)
June 5, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
June 5, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, )
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Plano, Texas ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7296616.), filed by Elevated Women's Sober Living LLC, Constance Swanston. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hunt, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Women's Elevated Sober Living LLC et al v. City of Plano, Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Plano, Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Constance Swanston
Represented By: Richard M Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Women's Elevated Sober Living LLC
Represented By: Richard M Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Jones
Represented By: Christopher Patrick McGreal
Represented By: Rachel Beth Cohen-Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?