United States of America v. 13275 Emerald Hills, El Paso, Texas, Including All Buildings Appurtenances And Improvements Thereon
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: 13275 Emerald Hills, El Paso, Texas, Including All Buildings Appurtenances And Improvements Thereon
Claimant: El Paso County Emergency Services District No. 1, El Paso County, Texas, Socorro I.S.D., Paseo Del Este M.U.D. No. 10, El Paso Community College and University Medical Center
Case Number: 4:2019cv00413
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by El Paso Community College, El Paso County Emergency Services District No. 1, El Paso County, Texas, Paseo Del Este M.U.D. No. 10, Socorro I.S.D., University Medical Center Verified Claim of El Paso County, Texas, et al. (Gruver, Lori) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/18/2019: #1 Exhibit 1) (baf, ).
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 Original ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by El Paso County, Texas, El Paso Community College, University Medical Center, Socorro I.S.D., El Paso County Emergency Services District No. 1, Paseo Del Este M.U.D. No. 10.(Gruver, Lori)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 WRIT of of Entry issued (baf, )
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Writ of Entry by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McClendon, J)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - GRANTING #2 Motion to Seal Affidavit. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 6/7/2019. (baf, )
June 5, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
June 5, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (baf, )
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #1 Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(McClendon, J)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Seal Document Affidavit by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McClendon, J)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Forfeiture In Rem against 13275 Emerald Hills, El Paso, Texas, Including All Buildings Appurtenances And Improvements Thereon, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(McClendon, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 13275 Emerald Hills, El Paso, Texas, Including All Buildings Appurtenances And Improvements Thereon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 13275 Emerald Hills, El Paso, Texas, Including All Buildings Appurtenances And Improvements Thereon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: J Kevin McClendon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: El Paso County Emergency Services District No. 1
Represented By: Lori Gruver
Represented By: Douglas Steven Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: El Paso County, Texas
Represented By: Lori Gruver
Represented By: Douglas Steven Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Socorro I.S.D.
Represented By: Lori Gruver
Represented By: Douglas Steven Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Paseo Del Este M.U.D. No. 10
Represented By: Lori Gruver
Represented By: Douglas Steven Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: El Paso Community College
Represented By: Lori Gruver
Represented By: Douglas Steven Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: University Medical Center
Represented By: Lori Gruver
Represented By: Douglas Steven Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?