UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Bittner
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: Alexandru Bittner
Case Number: 4:2019cv00415
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 Defendant Alexandru Bittner ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Alexandru Bittner.(Katz, Farley)
June 21, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Alexandru Bittner to 7/31/2019. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( baf, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Alexandru Bittner.( Wu, Theodore)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Alexandru Bittner. (baf, )
June 6, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
June 6, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (baf, )
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT United States of America's Complaint against Alexandru Bittner, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Linder, Herbert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Bittner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexandru Bittner
Represented By: Farley P. Katz
Represented By: Theodore Joshua Wu
Represented By: Rachael Elisa Rubenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Holly Michele Church
Represented By: Herbert West Linder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?