McKinney v. UHS of Texoma, Inc.
Plaintiff: Teresa R McKinney
Defendant: UHS of Texoma, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00427
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kimberly C Priest Johnson
Referring Judge: Robert W Schroeder
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26(f) attorney conference on or before: August 26, 2019. File joint report of attorney conference: September 9, 2019. The case is SET for a Rule 16 management conference on Thursday, October 2, 2019, at 1:30 p.m. before the United States Magistrate Judge in Courtroom 108, 7940 Preston Road, Plano, Texas 75024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 8/6/2019. (daj, )
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by UHS of Texoma, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolf, Tracy)
July 24, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed SECOND Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for UHS of Texoma, Inc. to 8/2/2019. 7 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( baf, )
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re UHS of Texoma, Inc..( Wolf, Tracy)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tracy Graves Wolf on behalf of UHS of Texoma, Inc. (Wolf, Tracy)
June 21, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for UHS of Texoma, Inc. to 7/26/2019. 21 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( baf, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re UHS of Texoma, Inc..( Sedge, Brent)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. The Court REFERS the above-styled and numbered civil action to United States Magistrate Judge Kimberly C. Priest Johnson to conduct all pretrial proceedings in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 6/12/2019. (baf, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to UHS of Texoma, Inc.. (baf, )
June 10, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. (baf, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UHS of Texoma, Inc. d/b/a Texoma Medical Center ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7303342.), filed by Teresa R McKinney. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2). (Hopkins, Christine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKinney v. UHS of Texoma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UHS of Texoma, Inc.
Represented By: Brent Douglas Sedge
Represented By: Tracy Graves Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa R McKinney
Represented By: Carmen Artaza
Represented By: Christine Ann Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?