KAREN F. NEWTON REVOCABLE TRUST et al v. CANADIAN REAL ESTATE HOLDINGS, LP
Plaintiff: SANDRA GRAHAM, DEBBIE CHESNEY, JANET ANDERS, RAUL PEREZ, JR., JOE W. CHESNEY, SATHU SUBBIAH, JILL RUSE-PETERSON, GARY PIERCE, JERRY LONG, LINDA SOLTYSIK, TISHA DAVIS, KRIS TROTTER, CHARLIE PYNE, WILLIAM JONES, ROBERT CARTER, DAVID COX, GRETCHEN JERNIGAN, TIM ANDERS, JON MERCER, TERRY A. PETERSON, JAMES SCHWARTZ, JENNIFER COX, JOE k. CHESNEY, BILL TROTTER, CAROL VANMETER, JOAN PYNE, KAREN CHESNEY, KAREN F. NEWTON REVOCABLE TRUST, MELINDA PIERCE, ROBERT SOLTYSIK, JOAN ROSE, MARILEE EVANS, SARAH SCHWARTZ, PAULA JONES, SHERRI LONG, MIKE SHEPHERD, KENT VANMETER, TED ROSE, BEAU DAVIS, MIKE BELL, TREY MONSON, COLEEN MONSON, STEPHANIE SHEPHERD, HARVEY GRAHAM, MARIA MERCER, JERRY BROWN, GREGG JERNIGAN and JAMES EVANS
Defendant: CANADIAN REAL ESTATE HOLDINGS, LP
Case Number: 4:2019cv00429
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kimberly C Priest Johnson
Referring Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Filing 20 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by CANADIAN REAL ESTATE HOLDINGS, LP. (Korn, Andrew)
July 30, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by JANET ANDERS, TIM ANDERS, MIKE BELL, JERRY BROWN, ROBERT CARTER, DEBBIE CHESNEY, JOE W. CHESNEY, KAREN CHESNEY, DAVID COX, JENNIFER COX, Joe K. Chesney, BEAU DAVIS, TISHA DAVIS, JAMES EVANS, MARILEE EVANS, HARVEY GRAHAM, SANDRA GRAHAM, GREGG JERNIGAN, GRETCHEN JERNIGAN, PAULA JONES, WILLIAM JONES, KAREN F. NEWTON REVOCABLE TRUST, JERRY LONG, SHERRI LONG, JON MERCER, MARIA MERCER, COLEEN MONSON, TREY MONSON, RAUL PEREZ, JR, TERRY A. PETERSON, GARY PIERCE, MELINDA PIERCE, CHARLIE PYNE, JOAN PYNE, JOAN ROSE, TED ROSE, JILL RUSE-PETERSON, JAMES SCHWARTZ, SARAH SCHWARTZ, MIKE SHEPHERD, STEPHANIE SHEPHERD, LINDA SOLTYSIK, ROBERT SOLTYSIK, SATHU SUBBIAH, BILL TROTTER, KRIS TROTTER, CAROL VANMETER, KENT VANMETER. (Garrey, Robert)
July 30, 2019 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the REPLY - SUBMITTED DOCUMENT #18 - DOCUMENT EXCEEDS THE PAGE LIMIT. Correction should be made by ONE BUSINESS DAY (baf, )
July 29, 2019 Filing 18 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - PLEASE DISREGARD***REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by JANET ANDERS, TIM ANDERS, MIKE BELL, JERRY BROWN, ROBERT CARTER, DEBBIE CHESNEY, JOE W. CHESNEY, KAREN CHESNEY, DAVID COX, JENNIFER COX, Joe K. Chesney, BEAU DAVIS, TISHA DAVIS, JAMES EVANS, MARILEE EVANS, HARVEY GRAHAM, SANDRA GRAHAM, GREGG JERNIGAN, GRETCHEN JERNIGAN, PAULA JONES, WILLIAM JONES, KAREN F. NEWTON REVOCABLE TRUST, JERRY LONG, SHERRI LONG, JON MERCER, MARIA MERCER, COLEEN MONSON, TREY MONSON, RAUL PEREZ, JR, TERRY A. PETERSON, GARY PIERCE, MELINDA PIERCE, CHARLIE PYNE, JOAN PYNE, JOAN ROSE, TED ROSE, JILL RUSE-PETERSON, JAMES SCHWARTZ, SARAH SCHWARTZ, MIKE SHEPHERD, STEPHANIE SHEPHERD, LINDA SOLTYSIK, ROBERT SOLTYSIK, SATHU SUBBIAH, BILL TROTTER, KRIS TROTTER, CAROL VANMETER, KENT VANMETER. (Garrey, Robert) Modified on 7/30/2019 (baf, ).
July 22, 2019 Filing 17 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #15 Response to Motion.. (Korn, Andrew)
July 22, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE by CANADIAN REAL ESTATE HOLDINGS, LP of Mooted Issues (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Korn, Andrew)
July 22, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by CANADIAN REAL ESTATE HOLDINGS, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Korn, Andrew)
July 16, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by CANADIAN REAL ESTATE HOLDINGS, LP. (Korn, Andrew)
July 9, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by JANET ANDERS, TIM ANDERS, MIKE BELL, JERRY BROWN, ROBERT CARTER, DEBBIE CHESNEY, JOE W. CHESNEY, KAREN CHESNEY, DAVID COX, JENNIFER COX, Joe K. Chesney, BEAU DAVIS, TISHA DAVIS, JAMES EVANS, MARILEE EVANS, HARVEY GRAHAM, SANDRA GRAHAM, GREGG JERNIGAN, GRETCHEN JERNIGAN, PAULA JONES, WILLIAM JONES, KAREN F. NEWTON REVOCABLE TRUST, JERRY LONG, SHERRI LONG, JON MERCER, MARIA MERCER, COLEEN MONSON, TREY MONSON, RAUL PEREZ, JR, TERRY A. PETERSON, GARY PIERCE, MELINDA PIERCE, CHARLIE PYNE, JOAN PYNE, JOAN ROSE, TED ROSE, JILL RUSE-PETERSON, JAMES SCHWARTZ, SARAH SCHWARTZ, MIKE SHEPHERD, STEPHANIE SHEPHERD, LINDA SOLTYSIK, ROBERT SOLTYSIK, SATHU SUBBIAH, BILL TROTTER, KRIS TROTTER, CAROL VANMETER, KENT VANMETER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Garrey, Robert)
July 9, 2019 Filing 12 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court .. (Garrey, Robert)
July 8, 2019 ***FILED IN ERROR - DOCUMENT IS A LETTER. Document # 11, NOTICE. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (baf, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 11 ***PLEASE DISREGARD - FILED IN ERROR***NOTICE by JANET ANDERS, TIM ANDERS, MIKE BELL, JERRY BROWN, ROBERT CARTER, DEBBIE CHESNEY, JOE W. CHESNEY, KAREN CHESNEY, DAVID COX, JENNIFER COX, Joe K. Chesney, BEAU DAVIS, TISHA DAVIS, JAMES EVANS, MARILEE EVANS, HARVEY GRAHAM, SANDRA GRAHAM, GREGG JERNIGAN, GRETCHEN JERNIGAN, PAULA JONES, WILLIAM JONES, KAREN F. NEWTON REVOCABLE TRUST, JERRY LONG, SHERRI LONG, JON MERCER, MARIA MERCER, COLEEN MONSON, TREY MONSON, RAUL PEREZ, JR, TERRY A. PETERSON, GARY PIERCE, MELINDA PIERCE, CHARLIE PYNE, JOAN PYNE, JOAN ROSE, TED ROSE, JILL RUSE-PETERSON, JAMES SCHWARTZ, SARAH SCHWARTZ, MIKE SHEPHERD, STEPHANIE SHEPHERD, LINDA SOLTYSIK, ROBERT SOLTYSIK, SATHU SUBBIAH, BILL TROTTER, KRIS TROTTER, CAROL VANMETER, KENT VANMETER re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Corrected Exhibit 1 to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand)(Garrey, Robert) Modified on 7/8/2019 (baf, ).
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand to State Court by JANET ANDERS, TIM ANDERS, MIKE BELL, JERRY BROWN, ROBERT CARTER, DEBBIE CHESNEY, JOE W. CHESNEY, KAREN CHESNEY, DAVID COX, JENNIFER COX, Joe K. Chesney, BEAU DAVIS, TISHA DAVIS, JAMES EVANS, MARILEE EVANS, HARVEY GRAHAM, SANDRA GRAHAM, GREGG JERNIGAN, GRETCHEN JERNIGAN, PAULA JONES, WILLIAM JONES, KAREN F. NEWTON REVOCABLE TRUST, JERRY LONG, SHERRI LONG, JON MERCER, MARIA MERCER, COLEEN MONSON, TREY MONSON, RAUL PEREZ, JR, TERRY A. PETERSON, GARY PIERCE, MELINDA PIERCE, CHARLIE PYNE, JOAN PYNE, JOAN ROSE, TED ROSE, JILL RUSE-PETERSON, JAMES SCHWARTZ, SARAH SCHWARTZ, MIKE SHEPHERD, STEPHANIE SHEPHERD, LINDA SOLTYSIK, ROBERT SOLTYSIK, SATHU SUBBIAH, BILL TROTTER, KRIS TROTTER, CAROL VANMETER, KENT VANMETER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Garrey, Robert)
June 24, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by CANADIAN REAL ESTATE HOLDINGS, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-7, #2 Exhibit 8-12, #3 Exhibit 13-15, #4 Exhibit 16-18, #5 Exhibit 19-21, #6 Exhibit 22-27, #7 Exhibit 28-30, #8 Exhibit 31-33, #9 Exhibit 34-35, #10 Exhibit 36)(Korn, Andrew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/25/2019: #11 Text of Proposed Order) (baf, ).
June 24, 2019 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the NOTICE OF RE-URGING OF MOTION submitted DOCUMENT #8 - THE ACTUAL MOTION TO DISMISS SHOULD BE FILED. Correction should be made by ONE BUSINESS DAY (baf, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - PLEASE DISREGARD*** MOTION to Dismiss by CANADIAN REAL ESTATE HOLDINGS, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Korn, Andrew) Modified on 6/24/2019 (baf, ).
June 24, 2019 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the NOTICE submitted DOCUMENT #7 - INCORRECT DOCKET EVENT USED FOR FILING - MOTION TO DIMSISS FILED AS A NOTICE. Correction should be made by ONE BUSINESS DAY (baf, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - PLEASE DISREGARD***NOTICE by CANADIAN REAL ESTATE HOLDINGS, LP Defendants Re-urging of Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Korn, Andrew) Modified on 6/24/2019 (baf, ).
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by CANADIAN REAL ESTATE HOLDINGS, LP re #2 Additional Attachments to Main Document, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Supplemental Certified Copy of State Court Docket Sheet)(Korn, Andrew)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #1 Notice of Removal,.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 2 - Documents filed in State Court, #2 Attachment 3 - List of Attorneys, #3 Attachment 4 - List of parties requesting a jury trial, #4 Attachment 5 - Name of court from which case is being removed)(Korn, Andrew)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 ***FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED IN STATE COURT***FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against CANADIAN REAL ESTATE HOLDINGS, LP, filed by WILLIAM JONES, MARILEE EVANS, JENNIFER COX, TREY MONSON, BEAU DAVIS, SATHU SUBBIAH, LINDA SOLTYSIK, KAREN F. NEWTON REVOCABLE TRUST, GARY PIERCE, MIKE BELL, ROBERT SOLTYSIK, GRETCHEN JERNIGAN, SANDRA GRAHAM, TISHA DAVIS, MARIA MERCER, KAREN CHESNEY, JOAN PYNE, DAVID COX, HARVEY GRAHAM, TERRY A. PETERSON, JAMES EVANS, JERRY LONG, BILL TROTTER, SARAH SCHWARTZ, MIKE SHEPHERD, DEBBIE CHESNEY, CAROL VANMETER, STEPHANIE SHEPHERD, ROBERT CARTER, JON MERCER, JERRY BROWN, JOE W. CHESNEY, JANET ANDERS, SHERRI LONG, JILL RUSE-PETERSON, KRIS TROTTER, Joe K. Chesney, JAMES SCHWARTZ, CHARLIE PYNE, TED ROSE, COLEEN MONSON, TIM ANDERS, PAULA JONES, KENT VANMETER, JOAN ROSE, GREGG JERNIGAN, MELINDA PIERCE, RAUL PEREZ, JR.(baf, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 ***COMPLAINT FILED IN STATE COURT***COMPLAINT against CANADIAN REAL ESTATE HOLDINGS, LP, filed by WILLIAM JONES, MARILEE EVANS, JENNIFER COX, TREY MONSON, BEAU DAVIS, SATHU SUBBIAH, LINDA SOLTYSIK, KAREN F. NEWTON REVOCABLE TRUST, GARY PIERCE, MIKE BELL, ROBERT SOLTYSIK, GRETCHEN JERNIGAN, SANDRA GRAHAM, TISHA DAVIS, MARIA MERCER, KAREN CHESNEY, JOAN PYNE, DAVID COX, HARVEY GRAHAM, TERRY A. PETERSON, JAMES EVANS, JERRY LONG, BILL TROTTER, SARAH SCHWARTZ, MIKE SHEPHERD, DEBBIE CHESNEY, CAROL VANMETER, STEPHANIE SHEPHERD, ROBERT CARTER, JON MERCER, JERRY BROWN, JOE W. CHESNEY, JANET ANDERS, SHERRI LONG, JILL RUSE-PETERSON, KRIS TROTTER, Joe K. Chesney, JAMES SCHWARTZ, CHARLIE PYNE, TED ROSE, COLEEN MONSON, TIM ANDERS, PAULA JONES, KENT VANMETER, JOAN ROSE, GREGG JERNIGAN, MELINDA PIERCE, RAUL PEREZ, JR.(baf, )
June 10, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
June 10, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III and REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson. (baf, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from 296th Collin County District Court, case number 296-02588-2019. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7304187), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachments 1-5)(Korn, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KAREN F. NEWTON REVOCABLE TRUST et al v. CANADIAN REAL ESTATE HOLDINGS, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANDRA GRAHAM
Represented By: Robert James Garrey
Represented By: Grady R Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEBBIE CHESNEY
Represented By: Robert James Garrey
Represented By: Grady R Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANET ANDERS
Represented By: Robert James Garrey
Represented By: Grady R Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAUL PEREZ, JR.
Represented By: Robert James Garrey
Represented By: Grady R Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOE W. CHESNEY
Represented By: Robert James Garrey
Represented By: Grady R Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SATHU SUBBIAH
Represented By: Robert James Garrey
Represented By: Grady R Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JILL RUSE-PETERSON
Represented By: Robert James Garrey
Represented By: Grady R Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARY PIERCE
Represented By: Robert James Garrey
Represented By: Grady R Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JERRY LONG
Represented By: Robert James Garrey
Represented By: Grady R Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINDA SOLTYSIK
Represented By: Robert James Garrey
Represented By: Grady R Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TISHA DAVIS
Represented By: Robert James Garrey
Represented By: Grady R Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KRIS TROTTER
Represented By: Robert James Garrey
Represented By: Grady R Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLIE PYNE
Represented By: Robert James Garrey
Represented By: Grady R Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM JONES
Represented By: Robert James Garrey
Represented By: Grady R Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT CARTER
Represented By: Robert James Garrey
Represented By: Grady R Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID COX
Represented By: Robert James Garrey
Represented By: Grady R Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GRETCHEN JERNIGAN
Represented By: Robert James Garrey
Represented By: Grady R Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIM ANDERS
Represented By: Robert James Garrey
Represented By: Grady R Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JON MERCER
Represented By: Robert James Garrey
Represented By: Grady R Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERRY A. PETERSON
Represented By: Robert James Garrey
Represented By: Grady R Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES SCHWARTZ
Represented By: Robert James Garrey
Represented By: Grady R Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNIFER COX
Represented By: Robert James Garrey
Represented By: Grady R Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOE k. CHESNEY
Represented By: Robert James Garrey
Represented By: Grady R Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BILL TROTTER
Represented By: Robert James Garrey
Represented By: Grady R Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAROL VANMETER
Represented By: Robert James Garrey
Represented By: Grady R Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOAN PYNE
Represented By: Robert James Garrey
Represented By: Grady R Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAREN CHESNEY
Represented By: Robert James Garrey
Represented By: Grady R Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAREN F. NEWTON REVOCABLE TRUST
Represented By: Robert James Garrey
Represented By: Grady R Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELINDA PIERCE
Represented By: Robert James Garrey
Represented By: Grady R Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT SOLTYSIK
Represented By: Robert James Garrey
Represented By: Grady R Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOAN ROSE
Represented By: Robert James Garrey
Represented By: Grady R Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARILEE EVANS
Represented By: Robert James Garrey
Represented By: Grady R Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SARAH SCHWARTZ
Represented By: Robert James Garrey
Represented By: Grady R Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAULA JONES
Represented By: Robert James Garrey
Represented By: Grady R Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHERRI LONG
Represented By: Robert James Garrey
Represented By: Grady R Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MIKE SHEPHERD
Represented By: Robert James Garrey
Represented By: Grady R Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENT VANMETER
Represented By: Robert James Garrey
Represented By: Grady R Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TED ROSE
Represented By: Robert James Garrey
Represented By: Grady R Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BEAU DAVIS
Represented By: Robert James Garrey
Represented By: Grady R Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MIKE BELL
Represented By: Robert James Garrey
Represented By: Grady R Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TREY MONSON
Represented By: Robert James Garrey
Represented By: Grady R Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COLEEN MONSON
Represented By: Robert James Garrey
Represented By: Grady R Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHANIE SHEPHERD
Represented By: Robert James Garrey
Represented By: Grady R Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HARVEY GRAHAM
Represented By: Robert James Garrey
Represented By: Grady R Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIA MERCER
Represented By: Robert James Garrey
Represented By: Grady R Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JERRY BROWN
Represented By: Robert James Garrey
Represented By: Grady R Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREGG JERNIGAN
Represented By: Robert James Garrey
Represented By: Grady R Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES EVANS
Represented By: Robert James Garrey
Represented By: Grady R Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANADIAN REAL ESTATE HOLDINGS, LP
Represented By: Andrew Ross Korn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?