Boston v. Orthofix Medical, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kathryn Boston
Defendant: Options Medical, LLC and Orthofix Medical, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00438
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) and Brief in Support filed by Orthofix Medical, Inc.. (Youpa, Jennifer)
August 5, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shelby Kay Taylor on behalf of Options Medical, LLC (Taylor, Shelby)
August 2, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) and Brief in Support filed by Kathryn Boston. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A, #2 Exhibit Ex. B)(Ellwanger, Jay)
August 2, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Options Medical, LLC (Shank, Mark)
August 2, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Under Rule 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) ( Responses due by 8/19/2019) by Options Medical, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shank, Mark) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/2/2019: #2 Exhibit A) (rpc, ).
July 30, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Lori K. Serratelli on behalf of Options Medical, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7371218. (Serratelli, Lori)
July 24, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kathryn Boston. Options Medical, LLC served on 7/12/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. (Ellwanger, Jay)
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sean Michael McCrory on behalf of Orthofix Medical, Inc. (McCrory, Sean)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/26/2019. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 9/10/2019 at 11:30 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 7/22/2019. (rpc, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Orthofix Medical, Inc. (Youpa, Jennifer)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) and Brief in Support by Orthofix Medical, Inc.. Responses due by 8/2/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Youpa, Jennifer)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kathryn Boston. Orthofix Medical, Inc. served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Ellwanger, Jay)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Options Medical, LLC. (rpc, )
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Orthofix Medical, Inc. (rpc, )
June 17, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
June 14, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7311669.), filed by Kathryn Boston. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ellwanger, Jay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boston v. Orthofix Medical, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Options Medical, LLC
Represented By: Shelby Kay Taylor
Represented By: Lori K. Serratelli
Represented By: Mark Alan Shank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orthofix Medical, Inc.
Represented By: Sean Michael McCrory
Represented By: Jennifer Ashmos Youpa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Boston
Represented By: Jay D Ellwanger
Represented By: Esha Janet Rajendran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?