Signature Systems Group, LLC v. Spartan Mat, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Signature Systems Group, LLC
Defendant: Spartan Composites, LLC and Spartan Mat, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00441
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Signature Systems Group, LLC. Spartan Composites, LLC waiver sent on 7/25/2019, answer due 9/23/2019. (Must, Brian)
July 26, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Signature Systems Group, LLC. Spartan Mat, LLC waiver sent on 7/25/2019, answer due 9/23/2019. (Must, Brian)
July 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher John Schwegmann on behalf of Spartan Composites, LLC, Spartan Mat, LLC (Schwegmann, Christopher)
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Barry I. Friedman on behalf of Signature Systems Group, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7363815. (Friedman, Barry)
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Brian T. Must on behalf of Signature Systems Group, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7363799. (Must, Brian)
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Spartan Composites, LLC, Spartan Mat, LLC, filed by Signature Systems Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(mll, )
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Heath, Julie)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #1 Complaint.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Verification to Original Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Original Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Original Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C to Original Complaint, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D to Original Complaint)(Heath, Julie)
June 17, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
June 14, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Signature Systems Group, LLC (Heath, Julie)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified against Spartan Composites, LLC, Spartan Mat, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7311765.), filed by Signature Systems Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Heath, Julie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Signature Systems Group, LLC v. Spartan Mat, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spartan Composites, LLC
Represented By: Christopher John Schwegmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spartan Mat, LLC
Represented By: Christopher John Schwegmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Signature Systems Group, LLC
Represented By: Julie E Heath
Represented By: Katie M. Ackels
Represented By: Barry I. Friedman
Represented By: Brian T. Must
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?