Farrell v. Argon Medical Devices, Inc.
Plaintiff: B.P. Farrell
Defendant: Argon Medical Devices, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00464
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant's Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Argon Medical Devices, Inc..(Smith, Janet)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Janet Landry Smith on behalf of Argon Medical Devices, Inc. (Smith, Janet)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/10/2019. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 9/26/2019 at 11:00 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/5/2019. (rpc, )
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 Defendant's Original ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Argon Medical Devices, Inc..(Martinson, Gavin)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by B.P. Farrell. Argon Medical Devices, Inc. served on 7/2/2019, answer due 7/23/2019. (Watsky, David)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Argon Medical Devices, Inc. (rpc, )
June 24, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
June 24, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Argon Medical Devices, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7322628.), filed by B P Farrell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Watsky, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farrell v. Argon Medical Devices, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B.P. Farrell
Represented By: David Kohlman Watsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Argon Medical Devices, Inc.
Represented By: Gavin Samuel Martinson
Represented By: Janet Landry Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?