Castillo v. The City of Grand Prairie, Texas
Plaintiff: Fernando Castillo
Defendant: The City of Grand Prairie, Texas
Case Number: 4:2019cv00472
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 29:754
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION to Change Venue with Supporting Brief by The City of Grand Prairie, Texas. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Supporting Appendix, #2 Text of Proposed Order Prop. Order)(Jeffrey, James)
August 22, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by The City of Grand Prairie, Texas.(Jeffrey, James)
August 22, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss & Brief by The City of Grand Prairie, Texas. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Jeffrey, James)
August 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Fernando Castillo Certificate of Interested Parties (Sinkule, Daryl)
July 18, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for The City of Grand Prairie, Texas to 8/22/2019. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( rpc, )
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re The City of Grand Prairie, Texas.( Jeffrey, James)
July 18, 2019 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the #6 STIPULATION as to Responsive Pleadings submitted by The City of Grand Prairie, Texas. The extension request should be made using the court's Unopposed Application for Extension. Correction should be made by one business day. (rpc, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by The City of Grand Prairie, Texas (Jeffrey, James)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD*** STIPULATION as to Responsive Pleadings by The City of Grand Prairie, Texas. (Jeffrey, James) Modified on 7/18/2019 (rpc, ).
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James T Jeffrey, Jr on behalf of The City of Grand Prairie, Texas (Jeffrey, James)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fernando Castillo. The City of Grand Prairie, Texas served on 7/2/2019, answer due 7/23/2019. (Sinkule, Daryl)
July 16, 2019 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the #3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on The City of Grand Prairie submitted by Fernando Castillo. It should be filed using event Summons Returned Executed. Correction should be made by one business day. (rpc, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 ***PLEASE DISREGARD. FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY. INCORRECT DOCKET EVENT USED*** AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on The City of Grand Prairie on 7/2/19, filed by Fernando Castillo. (Sinkule, Daryl) Modified on 7/16/2019 (rpc, ).
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to The City of Grand Prairie, Texas. (rpc, )
June 28, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
June 28, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Grand Prairie ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7329406.), filed by Fernando Castillo.(Sinkule, Daryl) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/28/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (rpc, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castillo v. The City of Grand Prairie, Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fernando Castillo
Represented By: Daryl John Sinkule
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Grand Prairie, Texas
Represented By: James T Jeffrey, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?