Thompson v. Martin et al
Plaintiff: Douglas Bruce Thompson
Defendant: Total Patient Care, LLC, EIS Holdings, LLC, Emily Martin, Trinity Personal Care, LLC and Total Patient Care of Fort Worth, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00484
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert W Schroeder
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Ordered that attorney Lindsey Nicole Iles is WITHDRAWN as counsel of record for Emily Martin in this matter. It is further ORDERED that William Ken Tapscott, Jr., of Thompson, Coe, Cousins & Irons, L.L.P., is hereby substituted as counsel of record for Emily Martin. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 8/28/2019. (rpc, )
August 27, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney Unopposed Motion to Substitute Counsel of Record by Emily Martin. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tapscott, William)
August 26, 2019 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the #8 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Motion to Substitute Counsel of Record submitted by Emily Martin. The Motion is missing a Certificate of Conference. Correction should be made by one business day. (rpc, )
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 ***DEFICIENT. TO BE REFILED. PLEASE DISREGARD*** MOTION to Substitute Attorney Motion to Substitute Counsel of Record by Emily Martin. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tapscott, William) Modified on 8/26/2019 (rpc, ).
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 Defendants Emily Martin and Total Patient Care, LLC's Original ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Emily Martin, Total Patient Care, LLC.(Iles, Lindsey)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued as to Trinity Personal Care, LLC. (baf, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to Total Patient Care of Fort Worth, LLC. (baf, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to EIS Holdings, LLC. (baf, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Total Patient Care, LLC. (baf, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Emily Martin. (baf, )
July 3, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
July 3, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. (rpc, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7336211.), filed by Douglas Bruce Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Quesada, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Martin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Total Patient Care, LLC
Represented By: Lindsey Nicole Iles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EIS Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily Martin
Represented By: William Ken Tapscott, Jr
Represented By: Lindsey Nicole Iles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinity Personal Care, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Total Patient Care of Fort Worth, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Bruce Thompson
Represented By: George A Quesada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?