KT Imaging USA, LLC v. Lightcomm Technology Co., Ltd.
Plaintiff: KT Imaging USA, LLC
Defendant: Lightcomm Technology Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00486
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 12 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Lightcomm Technology Co., Ltd. (rpc, )
August 22, 2019 Filing 11 Request by KT Imaging USA, LLC for Clerk's Entry of Default against Lightcomm Technology Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Dmitry Kheyfits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Entry of Default)(Kheyfits, Dmitry)
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KT Imaging USA, LLC. Lightcomm Technology Co., Ltd. served on 7/10/2019, answer due 7/31/2019. (Bartles, Catherine)
July 12, 2019 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the #9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint with Summonses, Civil Cover Sheet, and Rule 7.1 Disclosure served on Lightcomm Technology Co., Ltd submitted by KT Imaging USA, LLC. The document should be filed using event Summons Returned Executed. Correction should be made by one business day. (rpc, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 9 ***PLEASE DISREGARD. FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY. INCORRECT DOCKET EVENT USED*** AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint with Summonses, Civil Cover Sheet, and Rule 7.1 Disclosure served on Lightcomm Technology Co., Ltd through Liz Cordell, Secretary of State on 07/10/2019, filed by KT Imaging USA, LLC. (Bartles, Catherine) Modified on 7/12/2019 (rpc, ).
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Hanna Glomska Cohen on behalf of KT Imaging USA, LLC (Cohen, Hanna)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrey Belenky on behalf of KT Imaging USA, LLC (Belenky, Andrey)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dmitry Kheyfits on behalf of KT Imaging USA, LLC (Kheyfits, Dmitry)
July 5, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to Lightcomm Technology Co., Ltd. (rpc, )
July 5, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Bartles, Catherine)
July 5, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
July 5, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, )
July 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Catherine Susan Bartles on behalf of KT Imaging USA, LLC (Bartles, Catherine)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by KT Imaging USA, LLC (Davis, Stafford)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement (Original) against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7336724.), filed by KT Imaging USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davis, Stafford)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KT Imaging USA, LLC v. Lightcomm Technology Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lightcomm Technology Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KT Imaging USA, LLC
Represented By: Stafford Grigsby Helm Davis
Represented By: Andrey Belenky
Represented By: Dmitry Kheyfits
Represented By: Catherine Susan Bartles
Represented By: Hanna Glomska Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?