Parallel Network Licensing, LLC v. RamQuest, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Parallel Network Licensing, LLC
Defendant: RamQuest Software, Inc. and RamQuest, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00487
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Parallel Network Licensing, LLC. (Lennon, James)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Parallel Network Licensing, LLC. (Lennon, James)
August 26, 2019 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED submitted DOCUMENT #6 - THE COMPLETE TWO PAGE SUMMONS IS REQUIRED TO FILE A SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Correction should be made by ONE BUSINESS DAY (baf, )
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - PLEASE DISREGARD***SUMMONS Returned Executed by Parallel Network Licensing, LLC. RamQuest Software, Inc. served on 8/20/2019, answer due 9/10/2019; RamQuest, Inc. served on 8/20/2019, answer due 9/10/2019. (Lennon, James) Modified on 8/26/2019 (baf, ).
July 5, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to RamQuest Software, Inc.. (daj, )
July 5, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to RamQuest, Inc.. (daj, )
July 5, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (daj, )
July 5, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (daj, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Lennon, James)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against RamQuest Software, Inc., RamQuest, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7336727.), filed by Parallel Network Licensing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lennon, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parallel Network Licensing, LLC v. RamQuest, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RamQuest Software, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RamQuest, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parallel Network Licensing, LLC
Represented By: James M Lennon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?