Martinez v. Franco, et al
Plaintiff: Oscar Martinez
Defendant: Fallas Landscape, Ltd, Anselmo Garcia and Anselmo Garcia Franco
Case Number: 4:2019cv00495
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sean D Jordan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Fallas Landscape, LTD to 10/7/2019. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( baf, )
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Fallas Landscape, LTD.( Hoodenpyle, Todd)
September 3, 2019 ***FILED IN ERROR - PLEASE DISREGARD - ANSWER DEADLINE IS NOT STIPULATED - PLEASE SEE LOCAL RULE CV-12. Document # 5, STIPULATION. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (baf, )
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 ***PLEASE DISREGARD - DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR***STIPULATION re #1 Complaint extending answer deadline for Fallas Landscape by Fallas Landscape, LTD. (Hoodenpyle, Todd) Modified on 9/3/2019 (baf, ).
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER TRANSFERRING CIVIL CASES. It is hereby ORDERED that this civil action is transferred to the Honorable Sean D. Jordan, effective immediately. Upon transfer, any pretrial referral to a Magistrate Judge is REVOKED except in Social Security cases, Pro Se Non-Prisoner/Habeas cases, and mortgage cases, where the pretrial referral will stay in place. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by United States District Judge Amos L. Mazzant. District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III no longer assigned to the case. (kls, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to Anselmo Garcia Franco. (baf, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Fallas Landscape, LTD. (baf, )
July 10, 2019 ***FILED IN ERROR - SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED ARE NOT FILED. Document # 2, ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT TO MAIN DOCUMENT. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (baf, )
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 ***PLEASE DISREGARD - SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FILED IN ERROR***Additional Attachments to Main Document:. (Attachments: #1 Request for Summons (Garcia))(Eisenbrey, Rebecca) Modified on 7/10/2019 (baf, ).
July 8, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
July 8, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (baf, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7340099.), filed by Oscar Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 FLSA consent to sue)(Eisenbrey, Rebecca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. Franco, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fallas Landscape, Ltd
Represented By: Todd Alan Hoodenpyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anselmo Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anselmo Garcia Franco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Martinez
Represented By: Rebecca Clare Eisenbrey
Represented By: Christopher Joseph Willett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?