Hines v. Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC
Plaintiff: Vanessa Hines
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00518
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert W Schroeder
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. ORDERED that all claims and causes of action asserted by Plaintiff against Defendant are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 7/23/2019. (rpc, )
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. This case is set for a scheduling conference in Texarkana, Texas on August 20, 2019 at 11:15 a.m. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 7/23/2019. (rpc, )
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Vanessa Hines. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Truncale, Brian)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** ANSWER to #2 Petition by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC.(rpc, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** PETITION against Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, filed by Vanessa Hines.(rpc, )
July 15, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
July 12, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. (rpc, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WALMART STORES TEXAS, LLC from 199th Judicial District, Collin County, Texas, case number 199-03160-2019. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7347689), filed by WALMART STORES TEXAS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Index of State Court Pleadings)(Davis, Derek)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hines v. Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa Hines
Represented By: Lawrence Fletcher Rolle
Represented By: Brian K Truncale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC
Represented By: Derek Shane Davis
Represented By: Samuel Hunter Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?