Honeycutt, Jr. v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Clifford A. Honeycutt, Jr.
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00542
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kimberly C Priest Johnson
Referring Judge: Sean D Jordan
2 Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REFERRAL ORDER. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636 and Local Rule CV-72, the undersigned hereby REFERS the cases set forth below to U. S. Magistrate Judge Kimberly C. Priest Johnson for all pretrial proceedings. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 9/18/2019. (rpc, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss)(Hayes, Elizabeth) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/17/2019) (rpc, ).
September 11, 2019 The Rule 16 management conference scheduled for 9/26/2019 before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III is cancelled. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 9/11/2019. (ldm, )
September 6, 2019 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Hayes, Elizabeth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/6/2019: #1 Proposed Scheduling Order) (rpc, ).
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER TRANSFERRING CIVIL CASES. It is hereby ORDERED that this civil action is transferred to the Honorable Sean D. Jordan, effective immediately. Upon transfer, any pretrial referral to a Magistrate Judge is REVOKED except in Social Security cases, Pro Se Non-Prisoner/Habeas cases, and mortgage cases, where the pretrial referral will stay in place. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by United States District Judge Amos L. Mazzant. District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III no longer assigned to the case. (kls, )
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed by Clifford A. Honeycutt, Jr..(Eltiar, Asem)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/10/2019. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 9/26/2019 at 02:30 PM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/6/2019. (rpc, )
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER AND ADVISORY. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 7/25/2019. (rpc, )
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marc Daniel Cabrera on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Cabrera, Marc)
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** ANSWER to #5 Petition by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.(rpc, )
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** PETITION against Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed by Clifford A. Honeycutt, Jr.(rpc, )
July 23, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
July 23, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, )
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert T Mowrey on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Mowrey, Robert)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Certificate of Interested Persons) (Hayes, Elizabeth)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Hayes, Elizabeth)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. from 401st District Court of Collin County TX, case number 401-02898-2019. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7360737), filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (index of matters being filed), #2 Civil Cover Sheet (Ex. B), #3 Exhibit C (state court docket sheet), #4 Exhibit C-1 (original petition), #5 Exhibit C-2 (civil case info sheet), #6 Exhibit C-3 (request for issuance of citation), #7 Exhibit C-4 (issued citation), #8 Exhibit C-5 (Application for TRO), #9 Exhibit C-6 (TRO), #10 Exhibit C-7 (Certificate of Cash Deposit in lieu of Bond), #11 Exhibit C-8 (motion for continuance), #12 Exhibit C-9 (order for continuance), #13 Exhibit C-10 (original answer), #14 Exhibit D (list of all parties), #15 Exhibit E (court from which case is removed), #16 Exhibit F (list of counsel of record), #17 Exhibit G (Collin County appraisal district property info))(Hayes, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Honeycutt, Jr. v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Elizabeth Frances Hayes
Represented By: Robert T Mowrey
Represented By: Marc Daniel Cabrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford A. Honeycutt, Jr.
Represented By: Asem Zaid Eltiar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?