Juarez et al v. 4T Mfg LLC et al
Plaintiff: Luis Manuel Cardoza Diaz and Irving Wilfredo Juarez
Defendant: 4T Mfg LLC and Kevin Hiebert
Case Number: 4:2019cv00549
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kimberly C Priest Johnson
Referring Judge: Sean D Jordan
2 Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER - GRANITNG #10 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Rebecca Currier is WITHDRAWN as counsel for the Plaintiffs in this matter. The Plaintiffs will continue to be represented by Allen Vaught of Baron & Budd, P.C. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 9/18/2019. (baf, )
September 13, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Change of Address by Allen Ryan Vaught (Vaught, Allen)
September 13, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Luis Manuel Cardoza Diaz, Irving Wilfredo Juarez. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Currier, Rebecca)
September 3, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
September 3, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Luis Manuel Cardoza Diaz, Irving Wilfredo Juarez. (Currier, Rebecca)
September 3, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Luis Manuel Cardoza Diaz, Irving Wilfredo Juarez. (Currier, Rebecca)
September 3, 2019 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the NOTICE submitted DOCUMENT #6 - EACH COMPLETED TWO PAGE SUMMONS SHOULD BE FILED SEPARATELY USING THE EVENT SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Correction should be made by ONE BUSINESS DAY (baf, )
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by 4T Mfg LLC, Kevin Hiebert.(Daniels, Ruth)
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - PLEASE DISREGARD***SUMMONS Returned Executed by Luis Manuel Cardoza Diaz, Irving Wilfredo Juarez. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Return of Service (4T Mfg LLC), #2 Exhibit B. Return of Service (Kevin Hiebert))(Currier, Rebecca) Modified on 9/3/2019 (baf, ).
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER TRANSFERRING CIVIL CASES. It is hereby ORDERED that this civil action is transferred to the Honorable Sean D. Jordan, effective immediately. Upon transfer, any pretrial referral to a Magistrate Judge is REVOKED except in Social Security cases, Pro Se Non-Prisoner/Habeas cases, and mortgage cases, where the pretrial referral will stay in place. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by United States District Judge Amos L. Mazzant. District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III and Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson no longer assigned to the case. (kls, )
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to Kevin Hiebert. (baf, )
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to 4T Mfg LLC. (baf, )
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Luis Manuel Cardoza Diaz, Irving Wilfredo Juarez Consent to Join Forms (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Join Forms of Juan David Cruz Reyes and Luis Olmedo Mendez)(Currier, Rebecca)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Luis Manuel Cardoza Diaz, Irving Wilfredo Juarez Plaintiffs' Notice of Potentially Related Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint)(Currier, Rebecca)
July 24, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
July 24, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III and REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson. (baf, )
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Plaintiffs' Original Complaint against 4T Mfg LLC, Kevin Hiebert ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7362290.), filed by Luis Manuel Cardoza Diaz, Irving Wilfredo Juarez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Consent to Become Party Plaintiff (Juarez, Irving Wilfredo), #3 Exhibit Exhibit B- Consent to Become Party Plaintiff (Cardoza Diaz, Luis Manuel))(Currier, Rebecca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Juarez et al v. 4T Mfg LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4T Mfg LLC
Represented By: Ruth Ann Daniels
Represented By: Jacob A Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Hiebert
Represented By: Ruth Ann Daniels
Represented By: Jacob A Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Manuel Cardoza Diaz
Represented By: Allen Ryan Vaught
Represented By: Rebecca Holly Currier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irving Wilfredo Juarez
Represented By: Allen Ryan Vaught
Represented By: Rebecca Holly Currier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?