Acosta v. Showtime Farms, Inc.
Plaintiff: Colleen Acosta
Defendant: Showtime Farms, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00554
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sean D Jordan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER TRANSFERRING CIVIL CASES. It is hereby ORDERED that this civil action is transferred to the Honorable Sean D. Jordan, effective immediately. Upon transfer, any pretrial referral to a Magistrate Judge is REVOKED except in Social Security cases, Pro Se Non-Prisoner/Habeas cases, and mortgage cases, where the pretrial referral will stay in place. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by United States District Judge Amos L. Mazzant. District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III no longer assigned to the case. (kls, )
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Showtime Farms, Inc. (rpc, )
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD*** MOTION Request to Issue Summons by Colleen Acosta. (McKay, Brandi) Modified on 8/9/2019 (rpc, ).
July 26, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
July 25, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, )
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Showtime Farms, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7365056.), filed by Colleen Acosta. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Agreement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(McKay, Brandi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acosta v. Showtime Farms, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Showtime Farms, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colleen Acosta
Represented By: Brandi Jo McKay
Represented By: Carlisle Anthony Braun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?