Skogen et al v. RFJ Auto Group, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan et al
Plaintiff: John Skogen and Cindy Skogen
Defendant: RFJ Auto Group, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan, Group & Pension Administrators, Inc., RFJ Auto Group, Inc. and ELAP Services, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00585
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kimberly C Priest Johnson
Referring Judge: Sean D Jordan
2 Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
September 26, 2019 Filing 8 Defendants RFJ's Original Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint ANSWER to #1 Complaint by RFJ Auto Group, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan.(Crosby, Amber)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REFERRAL ORDER. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636 and Local Rule CV-72, the undersigned hereby REFERS the cases set forth below to U. S. Magistrate Judge Kimberly C. Priest Johnson for all pretrial proceedings. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 9/18/2019. (baf, )
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John Skogen, Cindy Skogen. (Yelverton, Benjamin)
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John Skogen, Cindy Skogen. RFJ Auto Group, Inc. waiver sent on 8/5/2019, answer due 10/4/2019. (Yelverton, Benjamin)
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John Skogen, Cindy Skogen. ELAP Services, LLC waiver sent on 8/5/2019, answer due 10/4/2019. (Yelverton, Benjamin)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John Skogen, Cindy Skogen. RFJ Auto Group, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan waiver sent on 8/5/2019, answer due 10/4/2019. (Yelverton, Benjamin)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John Skogen, Cindy Skogen. Group & Pension Administrators, Inc. waiver sent on 8/5/2019, answer due 10/4/2019. (Yelverton, Benjamin)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER TRANSFERRING CIVIL CASES. It is hereby ORDERED that this civil action is transferred to the Honorable Sean D. Jordan, effective immediately. Upon transfer, any pretrial referral to a Magistrate Judge is REVOKED except in Social Security cases, Pro Se Non-Prisoner/Habeas cases, and mortgage cases, where the pretrial referral will stay in place. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by United States District Judge Amos L. Mazzant. District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III no longer assigned to the case. (kls, )
August 2, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
August 2, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, )
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Seeking Denied ERISA Benefits against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7377060.), filed by John Skogen, Cindy Skogen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Yelverton, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Skogen et al v. RFJ Auto Group, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RFJ Auto Group, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan
Represented By: Amber Hackett Crosby
Represented By: Donald W Gould, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Group & Pension Administrators, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RFJ Auto Group, Inc.
Represented By: Amber Hackett Crosby
Represented By: Donald W Gould, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELAP Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Skogen
Represented By: Benjamin Curtis Yelverton
Represented By: Tyler Bass Talbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Skogen
Represented By: Benjamin Curtis Yelverton
Represented By: Tyler Bass Talbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?