Vansill v. Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: Yvonne Vansill
Defendant: Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. and "Dollar Tree"
Case Number: 4:2019cv00612
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kimberly C Priest Johnson
Referring Judge: Sean D Jordan
2 Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc..(Blanchette, Robin)
September 18, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Yvonne Vansill.(Schorr, Geoffrey)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REFERRAL ORDER. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636 and Local Rule CV-72, the undersigned hereby REFERS the cases set forth below to U. S. Magistrate Judge Kimberly C. Priest Johnson for all pretrial proceedings. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 9/18/2019. (rpc, )
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER TRANSFERRING CIVIL CASES. It is hereby ORDERED that this civil action is transferred to the Honorable Sean D. Jordan, effective immediately. Upon transfer, any pretrial referral to a Magistrate Judge is REVOKED except in Social Security cases, Pro Se Non-Prisoner/Habeas cases, and mortgage cases, where the pretrial referral will stay in place. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by United States District Judge Amos L. Mazzant. District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III no longer assigned to the case. (kls, )
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND ADVISORY. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/20/2019. (rpc, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** ANSWER to #2 Petition by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.(rpc, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** PETITION against Dollar Tree Stores, Inc., filed by Yvonne Vansill.(rpc, )
August 19, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
August 19, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7398203), filed by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H)(Blanchette, Robin) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/19/2019: #9 Civil Cover Sheet) (rpc, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vansill v. Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvonne Vansill
Represented By: Andrew J Aldinger
Represented By: Geoffrey Emerson Schorr
Represented By: Hutton Wesley Sentell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Robin Nicole Blanchette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: "Dollar Tree"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?