STRAUSS v. LAKE CITY CREDIT et al
Plaintiff: FRED STRAUSS
Defendant: LAKE CITY CREDIT and GARY S. WILLIKY
Case Number: 4:2019cv00620
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sean D Jordan
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - GRANTING #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; GRANTING #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. It is therefore ORDERED that Defendant Williky has until November 29, 2019 to file an answer or otherwise appear in this case. It is further ORDERED that Defendant Lake City Credit has until November 29, 2019 to file an answer or otherwise appear in this case. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 10/21/2019. (baf, )
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and to Retain Counsel by LAKE CITY CREDIT. (Attachments: #1 Envelope(s))(baf, )
October 18, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and to Retain Counsel by GARY S. WILLIKY. (Attachments: #1 Envelope(s))(baf, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by FRED STRAUSS. LAKE CITY CREDIT served on 9/5/2019, answer due 9/26/2019. (Zelman, Yitzchak)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by FRED STRAUSS. GARY S. WILLIKY served on 9/9/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (Zelman, Yitzchak)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER TRANSFERRING CIVIL CASES. It is hereby ORDERED that this civil action is transferred to the Honorable Sean D. Jordan, effective immediately. Upon transfer, any pretrial referral to a Magistrate Judge is REVOKED except in Social Security cases, Pro Se Non-Prisoner/Habeas cases, and mortgage cases, where the pretrial referral will stay in place. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by United States District Judge Amos L. Mazzant. District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III and Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson no longer assigned to the case. (kls, )
August 27, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to GARY S. WILLIKY. (baf, )
August 27, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to LAKE CITY CREDIT. (baf, )
August 23, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
August 23, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III and REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson. (baf, )
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LAKE CITY CREDIT, GARY S. WILLIKY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7406267.), filed by FRED STRAUSS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Defendant's Collection Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, (Zelman, Yitzchak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STRAUSS v. LAKE CITY CREDIT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAKE CITY CREDIT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARY S. WILLIKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRED STRAUSS
Represented By: Yitzchak Zelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?