Branch Banking and Trust Company v. Re Rez L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Branch Banking and Trust Company
Defendant: Re Rez L.P. and Debra Peternana
Case Number: 4:2019cv00630
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kimberly C Priest Johnson
Referring Judge: Robert W Schroeder
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants Re Rez LP and Debra Peternana by Branch Banking and Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Briscoe Declaration, #2 Exhibit B - Gaither Declaration, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Gaither, Catherine)
October 2, 2019 Filing 14 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Debra Peternana and Re Rez L.P. (baf, )
September 30, 2019 Filing 13 Request by Branch Banking and Trust Company for Clerk's Entry of Default against All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX A - Declaration of Catherine E. Gaither)(Gaither, Catherine) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/2/2019: #2 Clerk's Entry of Default) (baf, ).
September 5, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Branch Banking and Trust Company. (Gaither, Catherine)
September 5, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Branch Banking and Trust Company. (Gaither, Catherine)
September 5, 2019 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED submitted DOCUMENTS #9 AND #10 - COMPLETED SUMMONS FORM FILED SHOULD BE THE ONE ISSUED AND SIGNED BY THE CLERK. Correction should be made by ONE BUSINESS DAY (baf, )
September 5, 2019 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED submitted DOCUMENT #7 AND #8 - INCOMPLETE DOCUMENT - THE COMPLETE TWO PAGE SUMMONS MUST BE FILED TO FILE A SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Correction should be made by ONE BUSINESS DAY (baf, )
September 5, 2019 Filing 10 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - PLEASE DISREGARD***SUMMONS Returned Executed by Branch Banking and Trust Company. (Gaither, Catherine) Modified on 9/5/2019 (baf, ).
September 5, 2019 Filing 9 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - PLEASE DISREGARD***SUMMONS Returned Executed by Branch Banking and Trust Company. (Gaither, Catherine) Modified on 9/5/2019 (baf, ).
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - PLEASE DISREGARD***SUMMONS Returned Executed by Branch Banking and Trust Company. Debra Peternana served on 9/4/2019, answer due 9/25/2019. (Gaither, Catherine) Modified on 9/5/2019 (baf, ).
September 5, 2019 Filing 7 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - PLEASE DISREGARD***SUMMONS Returned Executed by Branch Banking and Trust Company. Re Rez L.P. served on 9/4/2019, answer due 9/25/2019. (Gaither, Catherine) Modified on 9/5/2019 (baf, ).
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. The Court REFERS the above-styled and numbered civil action to United States Magistrate Judge Kimberly C. Priest Johnson to conduct all pretrial proceedings in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 9/4/2019. (baf, )
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 Case REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson. (baf, )
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to Re Rez L.P.. (baf, )
September 3, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Debra Peternana. (baf, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #1 Complaint.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I)(Gaither, Catherine)
August 29, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
August 29, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. (rpc, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7415869.), filed by Branch Banking and Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A - I, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Gaither, Catherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Branch Banking and Trust Company v. Re Rez L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Branch Banking and Trust Company
Represented By: Kenneth Craig Johnston
Represented By: Catherine Elizabeth Gaither
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Re Rez L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Peternana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?