Thiam v. T-Mobile USA, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Khouraichi Thiam
Defendant: T-Mobile USA, Inc.,, LG Electronics USA, Inc. and Metropcs Texas, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00633
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Khouraichi Thiam Mandatory Initial Disclosures (Witherspoon, Nuru)
October 23, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Bennett, Paul) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/24/2019: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (baf, ).
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 11/7/2019 at 11:00 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Rule 26 Meeting Joint Report due by 10/23/2019. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 9/19/2019. (baf, )
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER AND ADVISORY. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 9/10/2019. (rpc, )
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** ANSWER to #5 Petition by LG Electronics USA, Inc., Metropcs Texas, LLC, T-Mobile USA, Inc.(rpc, )
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** PETITION against LG Electronics USA, Inc., Metropcs Texas, LLC, T-Mobile USA, Inc.,, filed by Khouraichi Thiam.(rpc, )
August 30, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
August 30, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, )
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #1 Notice of Removal,.. (Bennett, Paul)
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #1 Notice of Removal,.. (Bennett, Paul)
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #1 Notice of Removal,.. (Bennett, Paul)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from 401st Judicial District Court, case number 401-03763-2019. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7417282), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement to Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Defendant's Index of Documents)(Bennett, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thiam v. T-Mobile USA, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T-Mobile USA, Inc.,
Represented By: Paul William Bennett
Represented By: Alex Johnathan Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics USA, Inc.
Represented By: Paul William Bennett
Represented By: Alex Johnathan Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropcs Texas, LLC
Represented By: Paul William Bennett
Represented By: Alex Johnathan Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khouraichi Thiam
Represented By: Nuru Lateef Witherspoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?