Hernandez et al v. Rush Enterprises, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Venita Beth Hernandez and Raymond Hernandez
Defendant: Schlumberger Limited, Schlumberger Technology Corporation, Holt Texas Ltd, Rush Enterprises, Inc. and Rush Truck Centers of Texas, LP
Case Number: 4:2019cv00638
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss by Schlumberger Limited, Schlumberger Technology Corporation. Responses due by 11/8/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Pltf's Amended Complaint, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Tanner, Hugh)
October 25, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss by Holt Texas Ltd. Responses due by 11/8/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Boland, Adam)
October 24, 2019 Filing 24 AMENDED ANSWER to #16 Amended Complaint by Rush Enterprises, Inc.. (Klatsky, Howard)
October 24, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWER to #16 Amended Complaint by Rush Truck Centers of Texas, LP.(Klatsky, Howard)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER. It is ORDERED that Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (Dkts. #10 , #11 ) are DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/15/2019. (rpc, )
October 15, 2019 Filing 21 SUMMONS Issued as to Rush Truck Centers of Texas, LP. (rpc, )
October 14, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Meredith Maxwell Bishop on behalf of Schlumberger Limited, Schlumberger Technology Corporation (Bishop, Meredith)
October 14, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Benjamin David Williams on behalf of Schlumberger Limited, Schlumberger Technology Corporation (Williams, Benjamin)
October 11, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to 12(b)(6) filed by Raymond Hernandez, Venita Beth Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Denying Holt Cat's Motion to Dismiss)(Sanford, Brian)
October 11, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Under Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Raymond Hernandez, Venita Beth Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Denying Schlumberger's Motion to Dismiss)(Sanford, Brian)
October 11, 2019 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Raymond Hernandez, Venita Beth Hernandez.(Sanford, Brian)
October 9, 2019 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Holt Texas Ltd (Ramirez, Sona)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/13/2019. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 12/2/2019 at 09:30 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/9/2019. (rpc, )
October 7, 2019 Counsel are advised that the Court has not opted out of this court's Local Rules concerning courtesy copies; therefore, Counsel are asked to comply with Local Rule CV-5(a)(9) and Local Rule CV-10(b) with respect to sending courtesy copies to Judge Mazzant. Please send copies of pleadings that exceed 20 pages to Judge Mazzant's chambers, and please use tabs and dividers for exhibits. (tls)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson recused. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 10/4/2019. (rpc, )
October 3, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Schlumberger Limited, Schlumberger Technology Corporation (Tanner, Hugh)
October 2, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to 12(b)(6) by Holt Texas Ltd. Responses due by 10/16/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Boland, Adam)
September 27, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Under Rule 12(b)(6) by Schlumberger Limited, Schlumberger Technology Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tanner, Hugh)
September 27, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Rush Enterprises, Inc. (Klatsky, Howard)
September 26, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Rush Enterprises, Inc..(Klatsky, Howard)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636 and the Local Rules of this Court for the Assignment of Matters to Magistrate Judges, the Court hereby REFERS the above-referenced case to the Hon. Kimberly C. Priest Johnson for all pretrial proceedings. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 9/10/2019. (rpc, )
September 5, 2019 Case Reassigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, )
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. The undersigned judge hereby recuses himself from the above-titled and numbered cause. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 9/5/2019. (rpc, )
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to Schlumberger Technology Corporation. (rpc, )
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to Schlumberger Limited. (rpc, )
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Holt Texas Ltd. (rpc, )
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Rush Enterprises, Inc. (rpc, )
September 4, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
September 3, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Sean D. Jordan. (rpc, )
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7420820.), filed by Raymond Hernandez, Venita Beth Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Sanford, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez et al v. Rush Enterprises, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Venita Beth Hernandez
Represented By: Brian Paul Sanford
Represented By: David Bryan Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Hernandez
Represented By: Brian Paul Sanford
Represented By: David Bryan Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schlumberger Limited
Represented By: Benjamin David Williams
Represented By: Hugh E Tanner
Represented By: Meredith Maxwell Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schlumberger Technology Corporation
Represented By: Benjamin David Williams
Represented By: Hugh E Tanner
Represented By: Meredith Maxwell Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holt Texas Ltd
Represented By: Sona Ramirez
Represented By: Adam David Boland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rush Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Paul Sharp
Represented By: Howard Jay Klatsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rush Truck Centers of Texas, LP
Represented By: Howard Jay Klatsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?