Doe v. William Marsh Rice University
Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: Donald Ostdiek, Ph.D., William Marsh Rice University dba Rice University, Emily Garza and William Marsh Rice University
Case Number: 4:2019cv00658
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Emily McLemore Smith on behalf of Emily Garza, William Marsh Rice University (Smith, Emily)
November 6, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Donald Ostdiek, Ph.D. to 12/3/2019. 20 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( rpc, )
November 6, 2019 Filing 9 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Donald Ostdiek, Ph.D..( Long, John)
October 21, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Emily Garza to 12/11/2019; William Marsh Rice University to 12/11/2019. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( rpc, )
October 18, 2019 Filing 8 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re William Marsh Rice University.( Kernell, Terry)
October 17, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued as to Donald Ostdiek, Ph.D. (rpc, )
October 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Russell Hardin, Jr on behalf of William Marsh Rice University (Hardin, Russell)
October 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Terry Dean Kernell on behalf of William Marsh Rice University (Kernell, Terry)
October 9, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John Doe. Emily Garza waiver sent on 9/12/2019, answer due 11/11/2019. (Hutchison, Susan)
October 9, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John Doe. William Marsh Rice University waiver sent on 9/12/2019, answer due 11/11/2019. (Hutchison, Susan)
September 12, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
September 11, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, )
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION re #1 Complaint to Proceed Under Pseudonym, and for Protective Order by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hutchison, Susan) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/12/2019) (rpc, ).
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7432563.), filed by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hutchison, Susan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. William Marsh Rice University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Ostdiek, Ph.D.
Represented By: John Daniel Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Marsh Rice University dba Rice University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily Garza
Represented By: Emily McLemore Smith
Represented By: Russell Hardin, Jr
Represented By: Terry Dean Kernell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Marsh Rice University
Represented By: Emily McLemore Smith
Represented By: Russell Hardin, Jr
Represented By: Terry Dean Kernell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Susan E Hutchison
Represented By: James Robert Hudson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?