Capers v. C.R. Bard Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Patricia Capers
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. and C.R. Bard Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00660
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sean D Jordan
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Filing 17 STATUS REPORT (JOINT STATUS REPORT) by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard Inc.. (Wahby, Peter)
November 5, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Laura Jean Baughman on behalf of Patricia Capers (Baughman, Laura)
November 5, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kristi Elizabeth Wood on behalf of Patricia Capers (Wood, Kristi)
November 5, 2019 Filing 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Sean D. Jordan: Status Conference held on 11/5/2019. (Court Reporter Gayle Wear.) (bss, )
October 24, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 11/5/2019 at 2:00 PM in Ctrm 105 (Plano) before District Judge Sean D. Jordan. (ldm)
September 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allison Marie Stewart on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard Inc. (Stewart, Allison)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - GRANTING #8 Motion to Withdraw. Richard B. North, Jr. shall be removed as Counsel for Bard. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 9/18/2019. (baf, )
September 17, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Karl Glenn Dial on behalf of All Defendants (Dial, Karl)
September 17, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter Samir Wahby on behalf of All Defendants (Wahby, Peter)
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Withdraw Defendants C. R. Bard, Inc. and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Previous Counsel Following Remand by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Griffith, Joseph)
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard Inc. identifying Corporate Parent C. R. Bard, Inc. for Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard Inc.. (Griffith, Joseph)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph P Griffith on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard Inc. (Griffith, Joseph)
September 12, 2019 Notified Attorney for Defendants, Richard B North, Jr, Per GO 04-12, this court no longer accepts pleadings in paper form. The Clerk will no longer mail or fax notices or orders to parties. All notices and orders generated by this court shall be sent electronically. ***ATTORNEY NOT ADMITTED TO PRACTICE IN OUR COURT - ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER SENT VIA EMAIL*** (baf, )
September 12, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
September 12, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Sean D. Jordan. (baf, )
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-01626. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 11, 2019 Remark: Case transferred to Eastern District of Texas via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED Re: #3 . Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/26/19. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Document for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/19/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
March 10, 2019 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-1626-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
March 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16632139 filed by Patricia Capers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Capers v. C.R. Bard Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.R. Bard Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Capers
Represented By: Thomas William Arbon
Represented By: Ben C Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?