Cunningham v. Creative Edge Marketing LLC et al
Plaintiff: Craig Cunningham
Defendant: Samuels Terrell, Creative Edge Marketing LLC, Terrell Samuels and John/Jane Does 1-5
Case Number: 4:2019cv00669
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Referring Judge: Christine A Nowak
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Terrell Samuels as to #9 Order. (baf, )
November 14, 2019 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Terrell Samuels as to #6 Order, Set Hearings, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines. (baf, )
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Defendant Creative Edge has thirty (30) days from the date of this Order to retain counsel and have such counsel file an appearance in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 10/314/2019. (baf, )
October 28, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Creative Edge Marketing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Envelope(s))(baf, )
October 24, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE to #5 Answer to Complaint Counter Claims by Craig Cunningham. (McRae, Leland)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 12/12/2019 at 2:30 PM in Ctrm A01 (Sherman - Annex) before Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak. Rule 26 Meeting Joint Report due by 11/27/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 10/24/2019. (baf, )
October 21, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Terrell Samuels. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope(s))(baf, )
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF REFERRAL. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636 and the Local Rules of this Court for the Assignment of Matters to Magistrate Judges, the Court hereby REFERS the above-referenced case to the Hon. Christine A. Nowak for all pretrial proceedings. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 9/19/2019. (baf, )
September 19, 2019 Case REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak. (baf, )
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Terrell Samuels. (baf, )
September 17, 2019 ***FILED IN ERROR - SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED INCORRECTLY FILED ON THE DOCKET. Document # 2, ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT TO MAIN DOCUMENT. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (baf, )
September 16, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
September 16, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (baf, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 ***PLEASE DISREGARD - SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED INCORRECTLY FILED ON THE DOCKET***Additional Attachments to Main Document: #1 Complaint.. (McRae, Leland) Modified on 9/17/2019 (baf, ).
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Original against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7438545.), filed by Craig Cunningham. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(McRae, Leland)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cunningham v. Creative Edge Marketing LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuels Terrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Creative Edge Marketing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrell Samuels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Cunningham
Represented By: Leland Garrett McRae
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?