Thompson v. CubeSmart Storage
Plaintiff: M. Nicole Thompson
Defendant: CubeSmart Storage
Case Number: 4:2019cv00671
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sean D Jordan
Referring Judge: Christine A Nowak
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Filing 11 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Order #7 sent to M. Nicole Thompson returned marked, "RETURN TO SENDER - UNCLAIMED -UNABLE TO FORWARD". (daj, )
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER ON AGREED STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that all claims between Plaintiff M. Nicole Thompson and Defendant Cubesmart, LLC shall be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE in their entirety, each party to bear their own costs and fees. All relief not previously granted is hereby DENIED. The Clerk is directed to CLOSE this civil action. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 10/31/2019. (daj, )
October 30, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION of Dismissal by CubeSmart Storage. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(England, Justin)
October 25, 2019 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by M. Nicole Thompson as to #4 Order. (rpc, )
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26(f) attorney conference on or before: October 31, 2019. File joint report of attorney conference: November 14, 2019. The case is SET for a Rule 16 management conference December 2, 2019 at 2:30 p.m., in the United States Courthouse Annex, 200 N. Travis St., Sherman, Texas 75090. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 10/11/2019. (daj, )
October 9, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by CubeSmart Storage. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Texas Self-Storage Rental Agreement, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(England, Justin)
October 9, 2019 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding document #5 (Motion to Dismiss) submitted by CubeSmart Storage. Exhibit(s) not filed in compliance with Local Rules. Correction should be made by one business day. (daj, )
October 8, 2019 Filing 5 DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - ATTORNEY MUST REFILE*** MOTION to Dismiss by CubeSmart Storage. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order on Defendant CubeSmart, LLC's Rules 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss)(England, Justin) Modified on 10/9/2019 (daj, ).
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file an Amended Complaint within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that service of process shall be withheld pending judicial screening of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 9/30/2019. (daj, )
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by M. Nicole Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(daj, )
September 17, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. **Consent form mailed to plaintiff. (daj, )
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to District Judge Sean D. Jordan and referred to Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate referral) (daj, )
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CubeSmart Storage, filed by M. Nicole Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(daj, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. CubeSmart Storage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. Nicole Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CubeSmart Storage
Represented By: Justin Patrick England
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?