Ayati-Ghaffari v. JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Appellant: Feysal Ayati-Ghaffari
Appellee: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Trustee: Carey D Ebert
Case Number: 4:2019cv00714
Filed: October 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Referring Judge: Roy S Payne
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Filing 29 Appellant's Memorandum in Support of MOTION for Relief from Judgment Bankruptcy Ch.13 Adversary & 2004 Examination by Feysal Ayati-Ghaffari. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Proposed Order)(daj, )
November 26, 2019 Filing 28 Appellant's Memorandum in Support of MOTION to Approve the Form of the Judgment by Feysal Ayati-Ghaffari. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(daj, )
November 21, 2019 Filing 27 UNABLE TO ISSUE CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT. (daj, )
November 19, 2019 Filing 26 Request by Feysal Ayati-Ghaffari for Clerk's Entry of Default against JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(kls, )
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER. Appellant's Motions (Dkt. No. #18 , Dkt. No. #20 , Dkt. No. #21 , Dkt. No. #22 , and Dkt. No. #23 ) are therefore DENIED. Further, Appellant's Objection is procedurally improper, and it does not provide any basis for revisiting the Court's previous rulings. Those Objections are therefore OVERRULED. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/19/2019. (daj, )
November 18, 2019 Filing 24 Judicial NOTICE of Appellant's Unrecognized Mortgage Claim Lacks Legal Merit of One-Party Case or Deposition Case by Feysal Ayati-Ghaffari (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(daj, )
November 14, 2019 Filing 23 Appellant's Memorandum in Support of MOTION to Alter & Vacate Wrong-Judgment by Feysal Ayati-Ghaffari. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(daj, )
November 13, 2019 Filing 22 Appellant's Memorandum in Support of MOTION to Reopen the Evidence by Feysal Ayati-Ghaffari. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(daj, )
November 12, 2019 Filing 21 Appellant's Memorandum in Support of MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Feysal Ayati-Ghaffari. (daj, )
November 12, 2019 Filing 20 Appellant's Memorandum in Support of MOTION for Reconsideration re #10 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction by Feysal Ayati-Ghaffari. (daj, )
November 12, 2019 Filing 19 Appellant's Objection to #10 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Feysal Ayati-Ghaffari. (daj, )
November 12, 2019 Filing 18 Appellant's Memorandum in Support of MOTION to Add Findings of Pre-Trial Fact by Feysal Ayati-Ghaffari. (daj, )
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 JUDGMENT. It is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that this action is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. All motions not otherwise addressed are DENIED. The Clerk is directed to CLOSE the above-captioned case. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/7/2019. (daj, )
November 6, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Enlarge Time by Feysal Ayati-Ghaffari. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(daj, )
November 5, 2019 Filing 15 Sealed Unredacted Transcript of 4-12-19 hearing. (daj, )
November 5, 2019 Filing 14 DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal Case No. 418cv483, #2 Motion to Dismiss Case No. 418cv483, #3 Report and Recommendation Case No. 418cv483, #4 Memo Adopting Report and Recommendation Case No. 418cv483)(daj, )
November 5, 2019 Filing 13 DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal by Feysal Ayati-Ghaffari re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, (Attachments: #1 Appellant Statement of Issues)(daj, )
November 5, 2019 Filing 12 DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal (Complete Record) re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, (Attachments: #1 Part 2 of 3, #2 Part 3 of 3)(daj, )
November 5, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Objection to Baseless Claim of Chase Bank by Feysal Ayati-Ghaffari (daj, )
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Chase's #8 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED and the above-captioned matter is DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/4/2019. (daj, )
October 28, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Feysal Ayati-Ghaffari. (daj, )
October 24, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order granting Appellee's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction)(York, Timothy)
October 21, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT in Support of Motion for Permission to Appeal in Forma Pauperis & Qualified for Pro Bono in this Noncore Defaulted Cause of Action Request by Feysal Ayati-Ghaffari, Carey D Ebert. (daj, )
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/11/2019. (nkl, )
October 11, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Feysal Ayati-Ghaffari. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(daj, )
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge. Pursuant to the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1) and (3) and the local rules for the assignment of duties to United States magistrate judges, the Court hereby REFERS this case to the Honorable Roy S. Payne for all pretrial purposes. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/9/2019. (daj, )
October 7, 2019 Electronic case file is in Bankruptcy Court. Please refer to the Bankruptcy Pacer site @ https://ecf.txeb.uscourts.gov to view/retrieve the record. (daj, )
October 7, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (daj, )
October 1, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (daj, )
October 1, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number BK18-41997. File received from US Bankruptcy Court, filed by Feysal Ayati-Ghaffari. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Cover Sheet, #2 Order No 64, #3 Transmittal Letter). (daj, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ayati-Ghaffari v. JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Feysal Ayati-Ghaffari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Represented By: Chandra Dianne Pryor
Represented By: Timothy Andrew York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Carey D Ebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?