Jackson v. Wilkie et al
Plaintiff: James Jackson
Defendant: Alicia Wright, Kimberly Coleman-Prier, Florine McCall, Robert Prier, Wayne Cryst, Henry Archer, Jeffrey Milligan, Robert L Wilkie and Jennifer Purdy
Case Number: 4:2019cv00721
Filed: October 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sean D Jordan
Referring Judge: Christine A Nowak
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting in part #27 "Motion for Extension of Time to Obtain Legal Councel [sic]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 11/19/2019. (daj, )
October 23, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for Extension of Time to Obtain Legal Councel [sic] by James Jackson. (daj, )
October 23, 2019 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Jackson. Alicia Wright served on 10/17/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (daj, )
October 23, 2019 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Jackson. Florine McCall served on 10/21/2019, answer due 12/20/2019. (daj, )
October 23, 2019 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Jackson. Kimberly Coleman-Prier served on 10/17/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (daj, )
October 23, 2019 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Jackson. Robert Prier served on 10/17/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (daj, )
October 23, 2019 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Jackson. Jennifer Purdy served on 10/18/2019, answer due 12/17/2019. (daj, )
October 23, 2019 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Jackson. Jeffrey Milligan served on 10/17/2019, answer due 11/7/2019. (daj, )
October 23, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Jackson. Henry Archer served on 10/18/2019, answer due 12/17/2019. (daj, )
October 23, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Jackson. Robert L Wilkie served on 10/23/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es), #2 Summons(es), #3 Summons(es), #4 Summons(es) Alternate address for Robert Wilkie). (daj, )
October 23, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Jackson. Wayne Cryst served on 10/17/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (daj, )
October 17, 2019 Filing 17 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by James Jackson as to #5 Order, #4 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel. (daj, )
October 15, 2019 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons(es), #2 Summons(es))(daj, )
October 15, 2019 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Jennifer Purdy. (daj, )
October 15, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Robert Prier. (daj, )
October 15, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Henry Archer. (daj, )
October 15, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Jeffrey Milligan. (daj, )
October 15, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Alicia Wright. (daj, )
October 15, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Florine McCall. (daj, )
October 15, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Kimberly Coleman-Prier. (daj, )
October 15, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Wayne Cryst. (daj, )
October 15, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Robert L Wilkie (alternate address). (daj, )
October 15, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Robert L Wilkie. (daj, )
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve Defendant on or before Wednesday, January 1, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 10/9/2019. (daj, )
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying without prejudice #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 10/9/2019. (daj, )
October 7, 2019 Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 6-49448. (mjc, )
October 3, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by James Jackson. (daj, )
October 3, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. **Consent form mailed to plaintiff. (daj, )
October 3, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to District Judge Sean D. Jordan and referred to Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate referral) (daj, )
October 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by James Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(daj, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Wilkie et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alicia Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Coleman-Prier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florine McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Prier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Cryst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Archer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Milligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L Wilkie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Purdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?