Pizza Hut, LLC v. Pandya et al
Plaintiff: Pizza Hut LLC
Defendant: Jignesh N. Pandya, JNP Foods LLC, Pandya Restaurants LLC, Ronak Roods LLC, JNP Foods, LLC, Ronak Pandya, Mozzarella Kitchen Company, LLC and 8 New Britain Pizza LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00726
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert W Schroeder
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE by Mozzarella Kitchen Company, LLC, Ronak Pandya re #34 Order on Motion for TRO,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Discovery,,,,,, #36 Notice (Other) Supplemental Notice re status (Slade, Jared)
November 27, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE by Pizza Hut LLC re #34 Order on Motion for TRO,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Discovery,,,,,, Parties' Notice Pursuant to Order (Brandt, Laura)
November 27, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jared Michael Slade on behalf of Mozzarella Kitchen Company, LLC, Ronak Pandya (Slade, Jared)
November 26, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 12/20/2019 at 01:00 PM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. (rpc, )
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #13 Motion for TRO and #19 Motion for Discovery. It is hereby ORDERED that the J. Pandya Defendants (Jignesh Pandya; Ronak Foods, LLC; JNP Foods, LLC; Pandya Restaurants, LLC; and 8 New Britain Pizza) and anyone acting in concert with the J. Pandya Defendants SHALL NOT, for a period of 28 days from this Order, engage, or assist others to engage, directly or indirectly, individually or as a partner, joint venturer, shareholder, officer, creditor, director, employee, or agent, in the production or sale (at wholesale or retail) of any pizza, pasta or other food items similar to Approved Products: (a) within a 25-mile radius of any Location; (b) anywhere within the county within which one or more Locations are situated; or (c) anywhere within 10 miles of a location in the United States at which [Pizza Hut] or any subsidiary, Affiliates or franchisee of Pizza Hut operates a System Restaurant on the date of termination or expiration of the Franchise Agreement. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer regarding the scope of limited written and deposition discovery relevant to a preliminary injunction and complete such discovery within 14 days of this Order. It is further ORDERED that Pizza Hut shall file a brief and record evidence in support of its request for a preliminary injunction by 5 p.m. on December 13, 2019. Defendants shall file any response by 5 p.m. on December 18, 2019. The Court SETS a preliminary injunction hearing at 1 p.m. on December 20, 2019 in Texarkana, Texas. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 11/26/2019. (rpc, )
November 26, 2019 Filing 33 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Plaintiff Amended Complaint; Plaintiff's Application for Temporary and Preliminary Injunctive Relief; and Order Setting Hearing served on Jignesh Pandya on 11/22/2019, filed by Pizza Hut LLC. (Richmond, William)
November 26, 2019 Filing 32 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Plaintiff Amended Complaint; Plaintiff's Application for Temporary and Preliminary Injunctive Relief; and Order Setting Hearing served on 8 New Britain Pizza on 11/22/2019, filed by Pizza Hut LLC. (Richmond, William)
November 26, 2019 Filing 31 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Plaintiff Amended Complaint; Plaintiff's Application for Temporary and Preliminary Injunctive Relief; Amended Appendix of Exhibits; and Order Setting Hearing served on Mozzarella Kitchen Company on 11/22/2019, filed by Pizza Hut LLC. (Richmond, William)
November 26, 2019 Filing 30 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Plaintiff Amended Complaint; Plaintiff's Application for Temporary and Preliminary Injunctive Relief; Amended Appendix of Exhibits; and Order Setting Hearing served on Mozzarella Kitchen Company on 11/22/2019, filed by Pizza Hut LLC. (Richmond, William)
November 26, 2019 Filing 29 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Plaintiff Amended Complaint; Plaintiff's Application for Temporary and Preliminary Injunctive Relief; Amended Appendix of Exhibits; and Order Setting Hearing served on Mozzarella Kitchen Company c/o Ronak Pandya on 11/22/2019, filed by Pizza Hut LLC. (Richmond, William)
November 25, 2019 Filing 28 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III: Motion Hearing held on 11/25/2019 re #13 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunctive Relief filed by Pizza Hut LLC, #19 MOTION for Discovery (Expedited) filed by Pizza Hut LLC. (Court Reporter Anna Lafrenz) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Sign In Sheet) (bas)
November 25, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE by Pizza Hut LLC re #13 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunctive Relief (Certificate of Service for Pleadings Related to Hearing on Plaintiff's Application for Temporary Restraining Order) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Process Server Mozzarella Kitchen Company, #2 Exhibit Parcel Mailing Details, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Organization, #4 Exhibit Affidavit of Process Server Mozzarella Kitchen Company c/o Ronak Pandya, #5 Exhibit Emails)(Richmond, William)
November 25, 2019 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the #25 Certificate of Service for Pleadings Related to Hearing on Plaintiff's Application for Temporary Restraining Order submitted by Pizza Hut LLC. The exhibits were not filed as separate attachments. See Local Rule CV-5. Correction should be made by one business day. (rpc, )
November 25, 2019 Filing 26 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #13 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunctive Relief.. (Richmond, William)
November 25, 2019 Filing 25 ***DEFICIENT. TO BE REFILED. PLEASE DISREGARD*** NOTICE by Pizza Hut LLC re #13 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunctive Relief (Certificate of Service for Pleadings Related to Hearing on Plaintiff's Application for Temporary Restraining Order) (Richmond, William) Modified on 11/25/2019 (rpc, ).
November 25, 2019 Filing 24 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #22 Response to Non-Motion,,.. (Harris, Craig)
November 25, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Glenn A. Parno on behalf of 8 New Britain Pizza LLC (Parno, Glenn)
November 24, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE to #13 Motion for TRO Responses in Opposition to Plaintiff's Emergency Application for Temporary and Preliminary Injunctive Relief by Defendants Ronak Foods, LLC; Pandya Restaurants, LLC; JNP Foods, LLC; Jignesh N. Pandya, Individually, and 8 New Britain Pizza, LLC filed by 8 New Britain Pizza LLC, JNP Foods, LLC, Jignesh N. Pandya, Pandya Restaurants LLC, Ronak Roods LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A - Declaration of Jignesh Pandya, #2 Affidavit Exhibit B - Declaration of Jignesh Pandya, #3 Affidavit Exhibit C - Declaration of Michael C. Whitticar, Esq., #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Harris, Craig)
November 22, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Glenn A. Parno on behalf of JNP Foods, LLC, Jignesh N. Pandya, Pandya Restaurants LLC, Ronak Roods LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7541993. (Parno, Glenn)
November 22, 2019 Filing 20 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #13 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunctive Relief.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Richmond, William)
November 21, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Discovery (Expedited) by Pizza Hut LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Expedited RFPs, #2 Exhibit RFA - JNP, #3 Exhibit RFA - MKC, #4 Exhibit RFA - Pandya Restaurants, #5 Exhibit RFA - J.Pandya, #6 Exhibit RFA - Ronak Foods, #7 Exhibit RFA - R.Pandya, #8 Exhibit H - Depo Topics, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Richmond, William)
November 21, 2019 Filing 18 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #13 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunctive Relief.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2-2, #2 Exhibit 4)(Richmond, William)
November 21, 2019 Filing 17 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #13 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunctive Relief.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2-1)(Richmond, William)
November 21, 2019 Filing 16 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #13 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunctive Relief.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Richmond, William)
November 21, 2019 Filing 15 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2-D Forbearance Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2-E Transfer Agreement)(Richmond, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/22/2019: #3 Text of Proposed Order) (rpc, ).
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Setting Hearing on #13 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunctive Relief. Motion Hearing set for 11/25/2019 at 02:30 PM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 11/21/2019. (rpc, )
November 21, 2019 Filing 13 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunctive Relief by Pizza Hut LLC. (Richmond, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/22/2019: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (rpc, ).
November 21, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Pizza Hut LLC.(Richmond, William)
October 23, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Pizza Hut LLC. Ronak Roods LLC waiver sent on 10/14/2019, answer due 12/13/2019. (Richmond, William)
October 23, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Pizza Hut LLC. Pandya Restaurants LLC waiver sent on 10/14/2019, answer due 12/13/2019. (Richmond, William)
October 23, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Pizza Hut LLC. JNP Foods LLC waiver sent on 10/14/2019, answer due 12/13/2019. (Richmond, William)
October 23, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Pizza Hut LLC. Jignesh N. Pandya waiver sent on 10/14/2019, answer due 12/13/2019. (Richmond, William)
October 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Pizza Hut LLC Certificate of Interested Parties (Richmond, William)
October 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Laura Elizabeth Brandt on behalf of Pizza Hut LLC (Brandt, Laura)
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to JNP Foods LLC. (daj, )
October 7, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to Ronak Roods LLC. (daj, )
October 7, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Pandya Restaurants LLC. (daj, )
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Jignesh N. Pandya. (daj, )
October 7, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (daj, )
October 7, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. (daj, )
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7465615.), filed by Pizza Hut LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Richmond, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pizza Hut, LLC v. Pandya et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pizza Hut LLC
Represented By: William S Richmond
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Brandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jignesh N. Pandya
Represented By: Craig A Harris
Represented By: Glenn A. Parno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JNP Foods LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pandya Restaurants LLC
Represented By: Craig A Harris
Represented By: Glenn A. Parno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronak Roods LLC
Represented By: Craig A Harris
Represented By: Glenn A. Parno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JNP Foods, LLC
Represented By: Craig A Harris
Represented By: Glenn A. Parno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronak Pandya
Represented By: Jared Michael Slade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mozzarella Kitchen Company, LLC
Represented By: Jared Michael Slade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 8 New Britain Pizza LLC
Represented By: Craig A Harris
Represented By: Glenn A. Parno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?