Artisan Construction DFW LLC et al v. Weisbart
Appellant: M. Christopher Limited LLC, Lucas Corners LLC, MCCH Holdings LLC, Rudy Rivas, MCCH 2009 LLC, Richard M. Rivas, M. Christopher Investments 2015 LLC, M. Christopher Custom Homes LLC, R. Rivas Enterprises LLC, R. Rivas Family Partnership LP, M. Christopher Residential LLC, M. Christopher Custom Pools LLC, R. Rivas Family Partnership LLC, Christopher Diversified Solutions LLC, Laura Rivas, Nortex Septic Systems LLC, MCCP LLC, Green Dream Outdoors LLC, M. Christopher Investments LLC 2011, Christophers Classic Cars LLC, Andy Rivas, Artisan Construction DFW LLC, James C. Rivas, Catherine Ann Rivas, Legacy Manor II, LLC, Artisan DFW Custom Pools LLC, MCCH Industries LLC, Metroplex Royal Flush LLC, R. Rivas Properties LLC, Artisan DFW Custom Homes Group LLC, M. Christopher Real Estate LLC and M. Christopher Construction LLC
Appellee: Mark A Weisbart
Case Number: 4:2019cv00774
Filed: October 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Marcia A Crone
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 NOTICE of receipt by Eastern District of Texas Bankruptcy Court of #3 Memorandum and Order. (rpc, )
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Leave to file an interlocutory appeal is denied. Asa consequence, this court is without jurisdiction to consider the appeal. Therefore, the appeal is dismissed and remanded. The clerk of the court is directed to forward a copy of this order to the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Eastern District of Texas. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 10/28/2019. (rpc, )
October 23, 2019 Filing 2 RESPONSE to #1 Bankruptcy Appeal,,,, /Defendants' Reply to Trustee's Objection to Motion for Leave to Appeal filed by Artisan Construction DFW LLC, Artisan DFW Custom Homes Group LLC, Artisan DFW Custom Pools LLC, Christopher Diversified Solutions LLC, Christophers Classic Cars LLC, Green Dream Outdoors LLC, Legacy Manor II, LLC, Lucas Corners LLC, M. Christopher Construction LLC, M. Christopher Custom Homes LLC, M. Christopher Custom Pools LLC, M. Christopher Investments 2015 LLC, M. Christopher Investments LLC 2011, M. Christopher Limited LLC, M. Christopher Real Estate LLC, M. Christopher Residential LLC, MCCH 2009 LLC, MCCH Holdings LLC, MCCH Industries LLC, MCCP LLC, Metroplex Royal Flush LLC, Nortex Septic Systems LLC, R. Rivas Enterprises LLC, R. Rivas Family Partnership LLC, R. Rivas Family Partnership LP, R. Rivas Properties LLC, Andy Rivas, Catherine Ann Rivas, James C. Rivas, Laura Rivas, Richard M. Rivas, Rudy Rivas. (Lindauer, Joyce)
October 21, 2019 Electronic case file is in Bankruptcy Court. Please refer to the Bankruptcy Pacer site @ https://ecf.txeb.uscourts.gov to view/retrieve the record. (rpc, )
October 21, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
October 21, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Marcia A. Crone. (rpc, )
October 21, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number BK19-04020. File received, filed by MCCH 2009 LLC, Rudy Rivas, M. Christopher Custom Pools LLC, Christopher Diversified Solutions LLC, M. Christopher Construction LLC, Artisan Construction DFW LLC, Catherine Ann Rivas, M. Christopher Investments LLC 2011, M. Christopher Limited LLC, James C. Rivas, Richard M. Rivas, Laura Rivas, R. Rivas Family Partnership LP, M. Christopher Residential LLC, MCCH Holdings LLC, Green Dream Outdoors LLC, Andy Rivas, Legacy Manor II, LLC, M. Christopher Investments 2015 LLC, M. Christopher Real Estate LLC, MCCP LLC, Artisan DFW Custom Homes Group LLC, Christophers Classic Cars LLC, R. Rivas Properties LLC, Metroplex Royal Flush LLC, Lucas Corners LLC, R. Rivas Family Partnership LLC, MCCH Industries LLC, R. Rivas Enterprises LLC, M. Christopher Custom Homes LLC, Nortex Septic Systems LLC, Artisan DFW Custom Pools LLC. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Cover Sheet, #2 Bankruptcy Docket Sheet, #3 Bankruptcy Motion for Leave to Appeal, #4 Bankruptcy Objection to Motion for Leave to Appeal, #5 Bankruptcy Order Denying Motion to Dismiss)(rpc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Artisan Construction DFW LLC et al v. Weisbart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: M. Christopher Limited LLC
Represented By: Joyce Williams Lindauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Lucas Corners LLC
Represented By: Joyce Williams Lindauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: MCCH Holdings LLC
Represented By: Joyce Williams Lindauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Rudy Rivas
Represented By: Joyce Williams Lindauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: MCCH 2009 LLC
Represented By: Joyce Williams Lindauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Richard M. Rivas
Represented By: Joyce Williams Lindauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: M. Christopher Investments 2015 LLC
Represented By: Joyce Williams Lindauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: M. Christopher Custom Homes LLC
Represented By: Joyce Williams Lindauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: R. Rivas Enterprises LLC
Represented By: Joyce Williams Lindauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: R. Rivas Family Partnership LP
Represented By: Joyce Williams Lindauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: M. Christopher Residential LLC
Represented By: Joyce Williams Lindauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: M. Christopher Custom Pools LLC
Represented By: Joyce Williams Lindauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: R. Rivas Family Partnership LLC
Represented By: Joyce Williams Lindauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Christopher Diversified Solutions LLC
Represented By: Joyce Williams Lindauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Laura Rivas
Represented By: Joyce Williams Lindauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Nortex Septic Systems LLC
Represented By: Joyce Williams Lindauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: MCCP LLC
Represented By: Joyce Williams Lindauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Green Dream Outdoors LLC
Represented By: Joyce Williams Lindauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: M. Christopher Investments LLC 2011
Represented By: Joyce Williams Lindauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Christophers Classic Cars LLC
Represented By: Joyce Williams Lindauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Andy Rivas
Represented By: Joyce Williams Lindauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Artisan Construction DFW LLC
Represented By: Joyce Williams Lindauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: James C. Rivas
Represented By: Joyce Williams Lindauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Catherine Ann Rivas
Represented By: Joyce Williams Lindauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Legacy Manor II, LLC
Represented By: Joyce Williams Lindauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Artisan DFW Custom Pools LLC
Represented By: Joyce Williams Lindauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: MCCH Industries LLC
Represented By: Joyce Williams Lindauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Metroplex Royal Flush LLC
Represented By: Joyce Williams Lindauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: R. Rivas Properties LLC
Represented By: Joyce Williams Lindauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Artisan DFW Custom Homes Group LLC
Represented By: Joyce Williams Lindauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: M. Christopher Real Estate LLC
Represented By: Joyce Williams Lindauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: M. Christopher Construction LLC
Represented By: Joyce Williams Lindauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Mark A Weisbart
Represented By: Jamie Nicole Kirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?