Juluke v. CNV #1 Investors LLC
Plaintiff: James Joseph Juluke, Jr.
Defendant: CNV #1 Investors LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00787
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kimberly C Priest Johnson
Referring Judge: Sean D Jordan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12181
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
December 18, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint by CNV #1 Investors LLC.(Hammel, William)
December 4, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for CNV #1 Investors LLC to 12/18/2019. 14 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( baf, )
December 4, 2019 Filing 5 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re CNV #1 Investors LLC.( Hammel, William)
November 20, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against CNV #1 Investors LLC, filed by James Joseph Juluke, Jr.(Mussman, Louis)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REFERRAL ORDER. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636 and Local Rule CV-72, the undersigned hereby REFERS the cases set forth below to U. S. Magistrate Judge Kimberly C. Priest Johnson for all pretrial proceedings. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 11/6/2019. (rpc, )
October 24, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to CNV #1 Investors LLC. (baf, )
October 24, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
October 24, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Sean D. Jordan. (baf, )
October 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CNV #1 Investors LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7492592.), filed by James Joseph Juluke, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mussman, Louis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Juluke v. CNV #1 Investors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNV #1 Investors LLC
Represented By: William Engler Hammel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Joseph Juluke, Jr.
Represented By: Louis I Mussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?