J.B. v. Frisco Independent School District
Plaintiff: J. B.
Defendant: Frisco Independent School District
Case Number: 4:2019cv00814
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Christine A Nowak
Referring Judge: Robert W Schroeder
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 20:1400
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. Scheduling Conference set for 1/21/2020 at 02:30 PM in Ctrm A01 (Sherman - Annex) before Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 12/20/2019. (rpc, )
December 19, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Frisco Independent School District.(Walker, Meredith)
December 4, 2019 CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD and Petitioner's Exhibits 48, 49, 57, and 69 received on CD and placed in Sherman Vault. (baf, )
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - GRANTING #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Original Complaint. It is therefore ORDERED that Defendant shall answer or otherwise file a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Original Complaint on or before December 20, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 11/27/2019. (baf, )
November 25, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Original Complaint by Frisco Independent School District. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Meredith)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. The Court REFERS the above-styled and numbered civil action to United States Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak to conduct all pretrial proceedings in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 11/20/2019. (rpc, )
November 14, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by J. B.. Frisco Independent School District served on 11/14/2019, answer due 12/5/2019. (Siebman, Clyde)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Frisco Independent School District. (rpc, )
November 12, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
November 8, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. (rpc, )
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Frisco Independent School District ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7516267.), filed by J. B.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Siebman, Clyde)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J.B. v. Frisco Independent School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frisco Independent School District
Represented By: Meredith Prykryl Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. B.
Represented By: Clyde Moody Siebman
Represented By: Roy Tress Atwood
Represented By: Anna Rebecca Skupin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?