Rachal v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Trustee: Office of the U.S. Trustee and Christopher Moser
Appellee: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Appellant: Francie B Rachal
Case Number: 4:2019cv00923
Filed: December 17, 2019
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeremy D Kernodle
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, (Attachments: #1 Appellee's Designations)(daj, )
January 27, 2020 Filing 5 DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, (Attachments: #1 Statement of Issues)(daj, )
December 20, 2019 Filing 4 DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, (Burks, H)
December 19, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle. (daj, )
December 19, 2019 Electronic case file is in Bankruptcy Court. Please refer to the Bankruptcy Pacer site @ https://ecf.txeb.uscourts.gov to view/retrieve the record. (daj, )
December 19, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (daj, )
December 17, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number BK19-43008. File received via email from Bankruptcy Court, filed by Francie B Rachal. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Cover Sheet, #2 Docket Sheet, #3 Order on Appeal, #4 Bankruptcy Order)(daj, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rachal v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Office of the U.S. Trustee
Represented By: Timothy Warren O'Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Christopher Moser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: H Gray Burks, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Francie B Rachal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?