United States of America (Internal Revenue Service) v. Joplin
Petitioner: United States of America (Internal Revenue Service)
Respondent: Jimmy C. Joplin
Case Number: 4:2019mc00030
Filed: April 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kimberly C Priest Johnson
Referring Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7402
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Hearing set for 6/12/2019 at 01:15 PM in Ctrm 108 (Plano) before Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 5/3/2019. (rpc, )
May 2, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
May 2, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III and REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson. (baf, )
April 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Petition to Enforce IRS Summonses against Jimmy C. Joplin, filed by United States of America (Internal Revenue Service). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 Exhibit ITR Summons, #3 Exhibit CIS Summons, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Yeager, Ruth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America (Internal Revenue Service) v. Joplin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jimmy C. Joplin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States of America (Internal Revenue Service)
Represented By: Ruth Harris Yeager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?