Moore, et al v. The Bank of New York Mellon, et al
Plaintiff: Diane and James Moore, Diane Moore and James Moore
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon, fka The Bank of New York as Successor in interest to JPMorgan Chase Bank NA as Trustee for Structured Asset Mortgage Investments II Inc. Bear Stearns ALT-A Trust 2005-5, Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC and The Bank of New York Mellon
Case Number: 4:2020cv00200
Filed: March 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Referring Judge: Christine A Nowak
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2020 Filing 16 Plaintiff's Answer to Defendants' First Amended Counterclaim by Diane Moore, James Moore. (Lane, Robert)
April 21, 2020 Filing 15 Defendants' Original ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint , First COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon.(Sheppard, Branch)
April 17, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE by Diane Moore, James Moore PLAINTIFFS CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES (Lane, Robert)
April 13, 2020 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon, filed by Diane Moore, James Moore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - DOT)(Lane, Robert)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER. Telephone Status Conference set for 8/11/2020 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 3/23/2020. (rpc, )
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/26/2021 at 09:00 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Amended Pleadings due by 8/4/2020. Discovery due by 10/27/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 6/23/2020. Jury instructions due by 2/12/2021. Mediation Completion due by 8/18/2020. Motions due by 8/18/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/27/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 3/23/2020. (rpc, )
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. It is ORDERED that the Rule 16 management conference set for Tuesday, May 12, 2020, at 2:00 p.m. is hereby CANCELED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 3/23/2020. (rpc, )
March 20, 2020 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Sheppard, Branch)
March 20, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon (Sheppard, Branch)
March 19, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon (Sheppard, Branch)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/21/2020. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 5/12/2020 at02:00 PM in Ctrm A01 (Sherman - Annex) before Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 3/17/2020. (rpc, )
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER AND ADVISORY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 3/17/2020. (rpc, )
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF REFERRAL. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636 and the Local Rules of this Court for the Assignment of Matters to Magistrate Judges, the Court hereby REFERS the above-referenced case to the Hon. Christine A. Nowak for all pretrial proceedings. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 3/16/2020. (rpc, )
March 11, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
March 11, 2020 Filing 3 ***ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM FILED IN STATE COURT*** ANSWER to #2 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Diane Moore, James Moore by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon.(baf, )
March 11, 2020 Filing 2 ***COMPLAINT FILED IN STATE COURT***COMPLAINT against Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon, filed by Diane Moore, James Moore.(baf, )
March 11, 2020 Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (baf, )
March 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon, fka The Bank of New York as Successor in interest to JPMorgan Chase Bank NA as Trustee for Structured Asset Mortgage Investments II Inc. Bear Stearns ALT-A Trust 2005-5 CV-20-44657 from District Court of Fannin County, Texas, case number 336th JUDICIAL DISTRICT. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7704802), filed by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon, fka The Bank of New York as Successor in interest to JPMorgan Chase Bank NA as Trustee for Structured Asset Mortgage Investments II Inc. Bear Stearns ALT-A Trust 2005-5. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Plaintiff's Original Petition, #2 Exhibit - Return of Service, #3 Exhibit - Defendants' Original Answer, #4 Exhibit - Index of Matters Being Filed, #5 Exhibit - State Court Docket Sheet, #6 Exhibit - Notice of Filing in State Court of Notice of Removal to Federal Court, #7 Exhibit - Affidavit of Appraisal District Record, #8 Exhibit - List of All Counse of Record, Addresses, Telephone Numbers, and Parties, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sheppard, Branch)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore, et al v. The Bank of New York Mellon, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane and James Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Moore
Represented By: Robert Chamless Lane
Represented By: Tyler Lee Basham
Represented By: Joshua David Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Moore
Represented By: Tyler Lee Basham
Represented By: Joshua David Gordon
Represented By: Robert Chamless Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon, fka The Bank of New York as Successor in interest to JPMorgan Chase Bank NA as Trustee for Structured Asset Mortgage Investments II Inc. Bear Stearns ALT-A Trust 2005-5
Represented By: Branch Masterson Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Branch Masterson Sheppard
Represented By: Sara Aniece Morton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Branch Masterson Sheppard
Represented By: Sara Aniece Morton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?