Scrum Alliance, Inc. et al v. Scrum, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Scrum Alliance, Inc. and Venture Agile, Inc.
Defendant: Jeff Sutherland, JJ Sutherland and Scrum, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00227
Filed: March 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/11/2020. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 6/26/2020 at 04:00 PM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 5/8/2020. (rpc, )
April 29, 2020 Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Jeff Sutherland to 6/1/2020; Scrum, Inc. to 6/1/2020; JJ Sutherland to 6/1/2020. 24 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( baf, )
April 28, 2020 Filing 17 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Scrum, Inc., JJ Sutherland, Jeff Sutherland.( Kletter, Dylan)
April 28, 2020 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the STIPULATION AND APPLICATION TO EXTEND ANSWER DEADLINE submitted DOCUMENT #16 - THE UNOPPOSED APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF ANSWER DEADLINE FORM SHOULD BE USED. Correction should be made by ONE BUSINESS DAY (baf, )
April 28, 2020 Filing 16 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - PLEASE DISREGARD***STIPULATION and Application to the Clerk of Court Regarding Defendants' Deadline to File Responsive Pleading by Scrum Alliance, Inc.. (Babcock, Charles) Modified on 4/28/2020 (baf, ).
April 24, 2020 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the MOTION TO DISMISS OR STAY, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO TRANSFER OR DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION AND IMPROPER VENUE submitted DOCUMENT #14 - OUR LOCAL RULES REQUIRE THAT EACH MOTION MUST BE FILED AS A SEPARATE DOCKET ENTRY AND ONLY ONE ALTERNATIVE RELIEF CAN BE REQUESTED PER DOCUMENT. Correction should be made by ONE BUSINESS DAY (baf, )
April 24, 2020 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Scrum Alliance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Babcock, Charles)
April 17, 2020 Counsel are reminded that the Court has not opted out of this court's Local Rules concerning courtesy copies; therefore, Counsel are asked to comply with Local Rule CV-5(a)(9) and Local Rule CV-10(b) with respect to sending courtesy copies to Judge Mazzant. Please send copies of pleadings that exceed 20 pages to Judge Mazzant's chambers. Please use tabs and dividers for exhibits. **If the current COVID-19 situation makes it difficult to send copies to the Court, Counsel are requested to send copies when feasible.*** (tls, )
April 16, 2020 Filing 14 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - PLEASE DISREGARD*** MOTION to Dismiss or Stay the Case in Favor of Arbitration or, In the Alternative, to Transfer or Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by Scrum, Inc., JJ Sutherland, Jeff Sutherland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 (Declaration of Dylan P. Kletter), #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Kletter Declaration, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Kletter Declaration, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Kletter Declaration, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 to Kletter Declaration, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 to Kletter Declaration, #7 Proposed Order)(Kletter, Dylan) Modified on 4/24/2020 (baf, ).
April 14, 2020 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Scrum, Inc., JJ Sutherland, Jeff Sutherland (Kletter, Dylan)
April 14, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Kelsey D. Bond on behalf of Scrum, Inc., JJ Sutherland, Jeff Sutherland. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7750939. (Bond, Kelsey)
April 14, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Dylan P Kletter on behalf of Scrum, Inc., JJ Sutherland, Jeff Sutherland. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7750920. (Kletter, Dylan)
April 8, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scrum Alliance, Inc., Venture Agile, Inc.. Scrum, Inc. served on 3/26/2020, answer due 4/16/2020. (Babcock, Charles)
April 2, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scrum Alliance, Inc., Venture Agile, Inc.. JJ Sutherland served on 3/30/2020, answer due 4/20/2020. (Babcock, Charles)
April 1, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scrum Alliance, Inc., Venture Agile, Inc.. Jeff Sutherland served on 3/26/2020, answer due 4/16/2020. (Babcock, Charles)
March 31, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Scrum Alliance, Inc., Venture Agile, Inc. (Babcock, Charles)
March 31, 2020 Case Reassigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. District Judge Sean D. Jordan no longer assigned to the case. (kls, )
March 25, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued as to Scrum, Inc.. (baf, )
March 25, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to JJ Sutherland. (baf, )
March 25, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to Jeff Sutherland. (baf, )
March 20, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Babcock, Charles)
March 19, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
March 19, 2020 Case Assigned to District Judge Sean D. Jordan. (rpc, )
March 18, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Scrum Alliance, Inc., Venture Agile, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Babcock, Charles) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/20/2020: #11 Text of Proposed Order) (rpc, ).
March 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7715040.), filed by Scrum Alliance, Inc., Venture Agile, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Babcock, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scrum Alliance, Inc. et al v. Scrum, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scrum Alliance, Inc.
Represented By: Charles L Babcock
Represented By: David Folsom
Represented By: Brian Harrison Oates
Represented By: Joel Robert Glover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Venture Agile, Inc.
Represented By: Charles L Babcock
Represented By: David Folsom
Represented By: Brian Harrison Oates
Represented By: Joel Robert Glover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Sutherland
Represented By: Dylan P Kletter
Represented By: Kelsey D. Bond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JJ Sutherland
Represented By: Dylan P Kletter
Represented By: Kelsey D. Bond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scrum, Inc.
Represented By: Dylan P Kletter
Represented By: Kelsey D. Bond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?