Cerda et al v. III Office Resource Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Edelman Sanchez, Marvin Leonel Lopez Gramajo, Sergio Cerda, William Alexander Lopez Sanchez and Eddi Estiver Lam Yoc
Defendant: III Office Resource Group, Inc. and Paul Ross Lowe, III
Case Number: 4:2020cv00249
Filed: March 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2020 Case transferred from Texas Eastern has been opened in Northern District of Texas as case 3:20-cv-01313, filed 05/20/2020. (baf, )
May 19, 2020 Interdistrict transfer to the NORTHERN District of TEXAS DALLAS Division. (baf, )
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ON MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE - GRANTING #6 Motion to Transfer Venue. It is therefore ORDERED that the Clerk shall transfer this matter to the District Clerk for the Northern District of Texas, Dallas Division, where the case shall be assigned for further disposition. As there is no opposition to the transfer of this case, the Clerk is instructed to transfer the case without delay. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 5/19/2020. (baf, )
May 18, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE by Sergio Cerda, Marvin Leonel Lopez Gramajo, Edelman Sanchez, William Alexander Lopez Sanchez, Eddi Estiver Lam Yoc re #6 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer Venue, #11 Order, of Non-Opposition (Forester, Jesse)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. Pending before the Court is Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue (Dkt. #6 ), to which no response has been filed. Plaintiffs shall file a response no later than May 26, 2020, or notify the Court that there is no opposition. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 5/15/2020. (baf, )
April 29, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE by Sergio Cerda, Marvin Leonel Lopez Gramajo, Edelman Sanchez, William Alexander Lopez Sanchez, Eddi Estiver Lam Yoc Regarding Service - Defendant III Office Resource Group, Inc. Served on 4/24/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Forester, Jesse)
April 29, 2020 ***FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY - COMPLETED TWO PAGE SUMMONS WAS NOT FILED. Document # 9, SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (baf, )
April 29, 2020 Filing 9 ***PLEASE DISREGARD - FILED IN ERROR***SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sergio Cerda. III Office Resource Group, Inc. served on 4/24/2020, answer due 5/15/2020. (Forester, Jesse) Modified on 4/29/2020 (baf, ).
April 20, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eddi Estiver Lam Yoc, Sergio Cerda, Marvin Leonel Lopez Gramajo, Edelman Sanchez, William Alexander Lopez Sanchez. Paul Ross Lowe, III served on 3/31/2020, answer due 4/21/2020. (Forester, Jesse)
April 20, 2020 Filing 7 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #6 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer Venue.. (Attachments: #1 Amended Certificate of Conference, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Clark, Steven)
April 20, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Transfer Venue by III Office Resource Group, Inc., Paul Ross Lowe, III. Responses due by 5/4/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Clark, Steven)
April 17, 2020 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE submitted DOCUMENT #5 - NO CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE AND PROPOSED ORDER DOES NOT COMPLY WITH OUR LOCAL RULE CV-7(a). Correction should be made by ONE BUSINESS DAY (baf, )
April 17, 2020 Filing 5 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - PLEASE DISREGARD*** MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer Venue by III Office Resource Group, Inc., Paul Ross Lowe, III. Responses due by 5/7/2020 (Attachments: #1 Supplement Brief in Support M to Transfer Venue, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Clark, Steven) Modified on 4/17/2020 (baf, ).
March 26, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to Paul Ross Lowe, III. (baf, )
March 26, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to III Office Resource Group, Inc.. (baf, )
March 25, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
March 25, 2020 Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (baf, )
March 25, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by Sergio Cerda, Eddi E Lam Yoc, Marvin L Lopez Gramajo, William A Lopez Sanchez, Edelman Sanchez of Filing Certificate of Interested Parties (Forester, Jesse)
March 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against III Office Resource Group, Inc., Paul R Lowe ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7725425.), filed by Eddi E Lam Yoc, Sergio Cerda, Marvin L Lopez Gramajo, Edelman Sanchez, William A Lopez Sanchez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Forester, Jesse)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cerda et al v. III Office Resource Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edelman Sanchez
Represented By: Jesse Hamilton Forester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin Leonel Lopez Gramajo
Represented By: Jesse Hamilton Forester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sergio Cerda
Represented By: Jesse Hamilton Forester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Alexander Lopez Sanchez
Represented By: Jesse Hamilton Forester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddi Estiver Lam Yoc
Represented By: Jesse Hamilton Forester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: III Office Resource Group, Inc.
Represented By: Steven Eugene Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Ross Lowe, III
Represented By: Steven Eugene Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?