Lawrence et al v. American Honda Motor Co., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Samson Lawrence and Rachel Lawrence
Defendant: American Honda Motor Co., Inc. and Honda Motor Company, Ltd.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00347
Filed: April 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert W Schroeder
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. Before the Court is Plaintiffs' Notice of Dismissal of Defendant Honda Motor Company, Ltd. Docket No. #8 . Plaintiffs are entitled to such a dismissal because Honda Motor Company has neither answered nor filed a motion for summary judgment. It is therefore ORDERED that Plaintiffs' claims against Honda Motor Company, Ltd. are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiffs' claims will remain against Defendant American Honda Motor Co., Inc. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 5/22/2020. (baf, )
May 20, 2020 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by American Honda Motor Co., Inc. (Crawford-Steger, Amanda)
May 20, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by J.L., Rachel Lawrence, Samson Lawrence (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Counts, Andrew)
May 18, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amanda Crawford-Steger on behalf of American Honda Motor Co., Inc. (Crawford-Steger, Amanda)
May 15, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Yesenia Esmeralda Cardenas-Colenso on behalf of American Honda Motor Co., Inc. (Cardenas-Colenso, Yesenia)
May 15, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
May 15, 2020 Filing 5 American Honda Motor Co., Inc. ANSWER to #1 Complaint by American Honda Motor Co., Inc..(Kern, Kurt)
April 24, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rachel Lawrence, J.L., Samson Lawrence. American Honda Motor Co., Inc. served on 4/24/2020, answer due 5/15/2020. (Tracy, E)
April 23, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to American Honda Motor Co., Inc.. (baf, )
April 23, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Honda Motor Company, Ltd.. (baf, )
April 23, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
April 23, 2020 Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. (baf, )
April 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Honda Motor. Co., Inc., Honda Motor Company, Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7763930.), filed by Rachel Lawrence, Samson Lawrence. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tracy, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lawrence et al v. American Honda Motor Co., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samson Lawrence
Represented By: Andrew Galen Counts
Represented By: Wendell Phillip Martens, Jr
Represented By: E Todd Tracy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Lawrence
Represented By: Andrew Galen Counts
Represented By: Wendell Phillip Martens, Jr
Represented By: E Todd Tracy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Honda Motor Co., Inc.
Represented By: Amanda Crawford-Steger
Represented By: Yesenia Esmeralda Cardenas-Colenso
Represented By: Kurt Christopher Kern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honda Motor Company, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?