Shilson v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Karren A. Shilson
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 4:2020cv00444
Filed: May 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sean D Jordan
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2020 Notified Attorneys, Dennis A. Costigan, Kimberly Wilson White, William J. Blakemore (for Plaintiff) and Christy D. Jones, David B. Thomas, Susan M. Robinson, Kari L. Sutherland, Kasey Mitchell Adams, Michael B. Hewes, William M. Gage (for Defendants), Per GO 04-12, this court no longer accepts pleadings in paper form. The Clerk will no longer mail or fax notices or orders to parties. All notices and orders generated by this court shall be sent electronically. ***ATTORNEY NOT ADMITTED TO PRACTICE IN OUR COURT ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER SENT VIA EMAIL*** (rpc, )
May 29, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
May 29, 2020 Case Assigned to District Judge Sean D. Jordan. (rpc, )
May 29, 2020 Filing 76 Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:13-cv-09236. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 22, 2020 Filing 75 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MDL #62 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (8501) Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot to Exclude Christina Pramudji)(Gage, William) (Modified on 5/25/2020 to add party filer) (mk). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
May 21, 2020 Filing 74 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #62 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2060) - Pls Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2065) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2134) Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2232) Pls Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2910) Defs Supp Resp and Notice of Adoption of Resp Regarding Timothy Ulatowski, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (7346) Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot of Timothy Ulatowski, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (8529) Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot of Timothy Ulatowski, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (8623) Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp Regarding Timothy Ulatowski)(Gage, William) (Modified on 5/25/2020 to add party filer) (mk). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
May 21, 2020 Filing 73 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #62 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2039) - Pls Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2042) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2187) Defs Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2247) Pls Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2455) Part 1 Pls Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2455) Part 2 Pls Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2458) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2553) Part 1 Defs Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2553) Part 2 Defs Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2553) Part 3 Defs Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2621) Pls Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (2839) Part 1 Pls Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (2839) Part 2 Pls Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (2841) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (2957) Defs Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (3037) Pls Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (8071) Pls Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (8073) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #19 Exhibit MDL ECF (8557) Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #20 Exhibit MDL ECF (8644) Notice of Adoption of Defs Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames)(Gage, William) (Modified on 5/25/2020 to add party filer) (mk). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
May 21, 2020 Filing 72 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #62 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2104) Pls Mot to Exclude Stanton Shoemaker, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2105) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Stanton Shoemaker, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2239) Defs Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude Stanton Shoemaker, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2923) Defs Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude Stanton Shoemaker, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (8513) Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot to Exclude Stanton Shoemaker, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (8625) Notice of Adoption of Defs Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude Stanton Shoemaker)(Gage, William) (Modified on 5/25/2020 to add party filer) (mk). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
May 21, 2020 Filing 71 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #62 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (6886) Pls Mot to Exclude Peter Sand, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (6890) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Peter Sand, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (6979) Defs Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude Peter Sand, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (8506) Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot to Exclude Peter Sand, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (8610) Notice of Adoption of Defs Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude Peter Sand)(Gage, William) (Modified on 5/25/2020 to add party filer) (mk). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
May 21, 2020 Filing 70 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #62 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2035) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Christina Pramudji, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2037) Pls Mot to Exclude Christina Pramudji, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2153) - Def's Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Christina Pramudji, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2236) Pls Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Christina Pramudji, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2530) Defs Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude Christina Pramudji, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (8614) Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot to Exclude Christina Pramudji)(Gage, William) (Modified on 5/25/2020 to add party filer) (mk). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
May 21, 2020 Filing 69 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #62 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (1992) Pls Mot to Exclude Maria Abadi, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (1993) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Maria Abadi, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2156) Defs Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude Maria Abadi, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2934) Defs Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude Maria Abadi, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (8475) Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot to Exclude Maria Abadi, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (8620) Notice of Adoption of Defs Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude Maria Abadi)(Gage, William) (Modified on 5/25/2020 to add party filer) (mk). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
May 21, 2020 Filing 68 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #62 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (5482) - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (5548) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (8541) - Notice of Adoption of Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (8599) Notice of Adoption of Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce)(Gage, William) (Modified on 5/25/2020 to add party filer) (mk). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
May 21, 2020 Filing 67 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #62 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2049) - Def's Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2163) Part 1 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2163) Part 2 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2163) Part 3 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2241) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 1 - Def's Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 2 - Def's Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 3 - Def's Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 4 - Def's Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 5 - Def's Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 6 - Def's Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 7 - Def's Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 8 - Def's Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 9 - Def's Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 10 - Def's Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 11 - Def's Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 12 - Def's Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 13 - Def's Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #19 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 14 - Def's Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #20 Exhibit MDL ECF (2817) - Def's Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #21 Exhibit MDL ECF (2818) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #22 Exhibit MDL ECF (2931) - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #23 Exhibit MDL ECF (3024) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #24 Exhibit MDL ECF (5332) - Def's Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #25 Exhibit MDL ECF (5333) - Def's Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig)(Gage, William) (Modified on 5/25/2020 to add party filer) (mk). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
May 21, 2020 Filing 66 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF # 62 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2200) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (3626) Part 1 - Def's Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (3626) Part 2 - Def's Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (3630) - Def's Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 1 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 2 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 3 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 4 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (3855) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (8519) Notice of Adoption of Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (8588) Notice of Adoption of Pls Resp Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge)(Gage, William) (Modified on 5/25/2020 to add party filer) (mk). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
May 21, 2020 Filing 65 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #62 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (1978) Part 1 - Def's Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 2 - Def's Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 3 - Def's Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 4 - Def's Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 5 - Def's Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 6 - Def's Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 7 - Def's Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 8 - Def's Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 9 - Def's Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 10 - Def's Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 11 - Def's Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 12 - Def's Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 13 - Def's Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 14 - Def's Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 15 - Def's Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 16 - Def's Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 17 - Def's Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 18 - Def's Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #19 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 19 - Def's Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #20 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 20 - Def's Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #21 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 21 - Def's Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #22 Exhibit MDL ECF (1982) - Def's Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #23 Exhibit MDL ECF (2188) Part 1 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #24 Exhibit MDL ECF (2188) Part 2 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #25 Exhibit MDL ECF (2188) Part 3 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #26 Exhibit MDL ECF (2188) Part 4 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge)(Gage, William) (Modified on 5/25/2020 to add party filer) (mk). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
May 21, 2020 Filing 64 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #62 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (3865) Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (8075) Part 1 - Def's Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (8075) Part 2 - Def's Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (8075) Part 3 - Def's Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (8075) Part 4 - Def's Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (8075) Part 5 - Def's Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (8075) Part 6 - Def's Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (8075) Part 7 - Def's Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (8075) Part 8 - Def's Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (8075) Part 9 - Def's Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (8075) Part 10 - Def's Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (8076) - Def's Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Valimir Iakovlev, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (8322) Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (8512) Notice of Adoption of Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (8585) Notice of Adoption of Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev)(Gage, William) (Modified on 5/25/2020 to add party filer) (mk). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
May 21, 2020 Filing 63 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #62 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2066) Part 1 - Def's Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 2 - Def's Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 3 - Def's Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 4 - Def's Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 5 - Def's Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 6 - Def's Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2070) - Def's Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Valimir Iakovlev, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 1 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 2 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 3 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 4 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 5 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 6 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 7 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 8 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 9 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 10 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 11 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #19 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 12 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #20 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 13 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #21 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 14 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #22 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 15 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #23 Exhibit MDL ECF (2251) Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #24 Exhibit MDL ECF (3790) Part 1 Pls Response to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #25 Exhibit MDL ECF (3790) Part 2 Pls Response to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #26 Exhibit MDL ECF (3790) Part 3 Pls Response to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev)(Gage, William) (Modified on 5/25/2020 to add party filer) (mk). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
May 21, 2020 Filing 62 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MDL ECF (238) First Amended Master Long Form Complaint, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (239) Master Answer of Ethicon, Inc. to First Amended Master Complaint, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (240) Master Answer of Ethicon LLC to First Amended Master Complaint, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (241) Master Answer of Johnson & Johnson to First Amended Master Complaint, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (262) - Short Form Complaint, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (263) Amended Short Form Complaint)(Gage, William) (Modified on 5/25/2020 to add party filer) (mk). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A directing that on 5/28/2020 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 5/27/2020 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/14/2020. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (maw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
October 17, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Dennis A. Costigan on behalf of Karren A. Shilson. (Costigan, Dennis) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
October 11, 2019 Filing 59 AMENDED NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Elizabeth A. Laposata on 10/17/2019 at 4:00 p.m.EST (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
October 8, 2019 Filing 58 RESPONSE by Karren A. Shilson to #57 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Elizabeth A. Laposata on 10/8/2019 at 10:30 a.m. (White, Kimberly) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
October 2, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Elizabeth A. Laposata on 10/8/2019 at 10:30 a.m. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
October 1, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Elizabeth A. Laposata on 10/7/2019 at 10:00 a.m. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
September 5, 2019 Filing 55 REPLY by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to #50 Response In Opposition,. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
September 5, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE of Withdrawal by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson re: #53 Reply to Response (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
September 4, 2019 Filing 53 REPLY by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to #50 Response In Opposition,. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
September 3, 2019 Filing 52 REPLY by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to #45 Response In Opposition. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
August 29, 2019 Filing 51 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Karren A. Shilson in support of #50 Response In Opposition (White, Kimberly) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
August 29, 2019 Filing 50 RESPONSE by Karren A. Shilson in opposition to #39 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Limit the Case Specific Testimony of Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(White, Kimberly) (Modified on 8/30/2019 to remove link to #40 Memorandum in Support)(slr). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
August 29, 2019 Filing 49 RESPONSE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in opposition to #43 DAUBERT MOTION by Karren A. Shilson to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Defense Expert E. Stanton Shoemaker, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
August 29, 2019 Filing 48 MEMORANDUM by Karren A. Shilson in opposition to #41 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Limit the Case Specific Opinions of Elizabeth A. Laposata, M.D. (White, Kimberly) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
August 29, 2019 Filing 47 RESPONSE by Karren A. Shilson in opposition to #41 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Limit the Case Specific Opinions of Elizabeth A. Laposata, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(White, Kimberly) (Modified on 8/30/2019 to remove link to #42 Memorandum in Support)(slr). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
August 28, 2019 Filing 46 MEMORANDUM by Karren A. Shilson in Support of Response in opposition to #37 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment (White, Kimberly) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
August 28, 2019 Filing 45 RESPONSE by Karren A. Shilson in opposition to #37 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit O, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit R)(White, Kimberly) (Modified on 8/29/2019 to remove link to #38 memorandum) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
August 15, 2019 Filing 44 MEMORANDUM by Karren A. Shilson in Support of #43 DAUBERT MOTION by Karren A. Shilson to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Defense Expert E. Stanton Shoemaker, M.D. (White, Kimberly) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
August 15, 2019 Filing 43 DAUBERT MOTION by Karren A. Shilson to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Defense Expert E. Stanton Shoemaker, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - CV - Dr. Shoemaker, #2 Exhibit B - Depo Transcript - Dr. Shoemaker, #3 Exhibit C - Expert Report, #4 Exhibit D - Documents Reviewed, #5 Exhibit E - Materials List, #6 Exhibit F - Materials List, Updated, #7 Exhibit G - CV - Dr. Zimmern, #8 Exhibit H - Depo Transcript - Dr. Zimmern, #9 Exhibit Ia - PFS, First Supp, part one, #10 Exhibit Ib - PFS, First Supp, part two, #11 Exhibit J - PFS, Second Supp, #12 Exhibit K - Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion)(White, Kimberly) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 42 MEMORANDUM by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in Support of #41 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Limit the Case Specific Opinions of Elizabeth A. Laposata, M.D.(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Limit the Case Specific Opinions of Elizabeth A. Laposata, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 40 MEMORANDUM by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in Support of #39 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Limit the Case Specific Testimony of Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Limit the Case Specific Testimony of Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
August 13, 2019 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson in Support of #37 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
August 13, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
July 22, 2019 Filing 36 OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in opposition to #34 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Karren A. Shilson of E. Stanton Shoemaker on August 7, 2019 at 3:00 p.m. CT (Gage, William) M [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
July 12, 2019 Filing 35 RESPONSES AND OBJECTIONS by Karren A. Shilson to #31 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D. on 7/29/2019 at 11:30 a.m. (White, Kimberly) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
July 11, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Karren A. Shilson of E. Stanton Shoemaker on August 7, 2019 at 3:00 p.m. CT (Attachments: #1 PTO 38 - Deposition Protocol)(White, Kimberly) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
July 2, 2019 Filing 33 AMENDED NOTICE TO TAKE VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Keith Kadesky, M.D. on 07/25/2019 at 3:00 pm (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PTO 38 Deposition Protocol, #2 Exhibit Subpoena to Testify at Deposition)(Hewes, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
June 27, 2019 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case Specific Expert Witnesses and Defendants Non-Retained Expert Disclosures. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
June 27, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D. on 7/29/2019 at 11:30 a.m. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Karren A. Shilson for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case-Specific Expert Witnesses. (White, Kimberly) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Keith Kadesky, M.D. on 06/27/2019 at 3:00 pm (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PTO 38 Deposition Protocol, #2 Exhibit Subpoena to Testify at Deposition to Keith Kadesky, M.D.)(Hewes, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
April 24, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Karren A. Shilson of Dr. Philippe Zimmern on June 14, 2019 at 3:00 p.m. (White, Kimberly) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
April 18, 2019 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson for Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Production and Requests for Admissions. (Adams, Kasey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
April 8, 2019 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Karren A. Shilson for Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' First Discovery Requests. (White, Kimberly) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
March 27, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Michael B. Hewes on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Hewes, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
March 19, 2019 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Karren A. Shilson for Request for Production of Documents. (White, Kimberly) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
March 19, 2019 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Karren A. Shilson for Requests for Admissions. (White, Kimberly) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
March 19, 2019 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Karren A. Shilson for Interrogatories. (White, Kimberly) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
March 18, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Karren A. Shilson for Plaintiff's Supplemental Fact Sheet. (White, Kimberly) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
March 12, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson of Karren Shilson on 05/02/2019 at 9:00 AM (Adams, Kasey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
March 8, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson for Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission and Requests for Production to Plaintiff. (Adams, Kasey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
March 1, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Kasey Mitchell Adams on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Adams, Kasey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PRETRIAL ORDER # 328 (Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 11 Cases) The cases on Exhibit A are: 1. removed from the pending inactive docket; and 2. placed on the active docket. As to the cases on Exhibits A and B: 1. The cases are no longer eligible for return to the inactive docket nor may notices of settlement be filed to relieve the parties from scheduling deadlines; 2. To the extent other defendants, in addition to Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson, are named in the cases on Exhibits A and B, the deadlines below also apply to them; 3. The Clerk will file this Docket Control Order in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in the main MDL, every case listed on Exhibits A and B (hereinafter referred to as "Wave 11 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order.; and 4. The following deadlines immediately apply in all Ethicon Wave 11 cases with one important exception. If any of the cases on any exhibit were previously on a docket control order and dispositive and Daubert deadlines had passed before such cases became inactive, the parties may not file or refile dispositive or Daubert motions without first seeking leave of court for good cause shown. A. SCHEDULING DEADLINES.. The following deadlines shall apply in all Ethicon Wave 11 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due 02/15/2019; Defendant Fact Sheets due 02/22/2019; Deadline for written discovery requests due 03/25/2019; Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs due 05/24/2019; Expert disclosure served by defendants due 06/24/2019; Expert disclosure served for rebuttal due 07/01/2019; Deposition deadline and close of discovery due 08/01/2019; Filing of dispositive motions due 08/14/2019; Response to dispositive motions due 08/28/2019; Reply to response to dispositive motions due 09/04/2019; Filing of Daubert motions due 08/14/2019; Responses to Daubert motions due 08/29/2019; Reply to response to Daubert motions due 09/05/2019. B. MOTION PRACTICE. 3. Confidential Documents. Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 6/27/2019, and any response is due by 7/11/2019. Any reply is due by 7/18/2019. The court expects full compliance with Local Rule of Civil Procedure 26.4(c). C. CASES READY FOR TRANSFER, REMAND OR TRIAL 1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 7/8/2019, the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 7/15/2019. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 2/4/2019. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 11 cases identified on Exhibits A and B) (ts) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting the Motions filed in MDL 2327 by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Substitute Susan M. Robinson as Counsel in lieu of David B. Thomas, and to Substitute William M. Gage as Counsel in lieu of Christy D. Jones; the Clerk is directed to terminate Christy D. Jones and to substitute William M. Gage as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which Christy D. Jones is associated, and to terminate David B. Thomas and to substitute Susan M. Robinson as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which David B. Thomas is associated. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/24/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (lca) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER The deadline to submit joint motions of dismissal is extended to 10/31/2018 for all cases in MDL 2327 currently on an inactive docket. All remaining provisions of Inactive Docket Orders entered in MDL 2327 and individual cases remain in effect. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/15/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases on inactive docket) (jsa) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER (CHANGE TO CHARACTERIZATION BY CLERK'S OFFICE OF CASES ON INACTIVE DOCKET) It is directed that in all cases with an inactive docket order which resulted in "Closed" and "MDL Ethicon Inactive" flags on the docket sheet, the Clerk is directed to update the docket by removing the "Closed" flag from the docket sheet and leaving the "MDL Ethicon Inactive" flag, for reasons set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/26/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Member Cases Flagged "Closed" and "MDL Ethicon Inactive") (kp) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER The deadline to submit joint motions of dismissal is extended to 8/31/2018 for all cases in MDL 2327 currently on an inactive docket. All remaining provisions of Inactive Docket Orders entered in MDL 2327 and individual cases remain in effect. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/16/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases on inactive docket) (mmw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER The deadline to submit joint motions of dismissal is extended to 3/31/2018 for all cases in MDL 2327 currently on an inactive docket. All remaining provisions of Inactive Docket Orders entered in MDL 2327 and individual cases remain in effect. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 10/19/2017. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases on inactive docket) (jld) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INACTIVE DOCKET ORDER: The court has been advised that the plaintiff(s) and Ethicon, Inc. have reached a settlement with regard to Ethicon. All discovery deadlines are continued until further order of the court. The Clerk is directed to retire this case from the active docket. Plaintiff(s) and Ethicon may submit an agreed order of dismissal with prejudice on or before 10/31/2017; if settlements are not finalized and dismissal orders are not submitted by then the Court will have a hearing to determine the appropriate action pertaining to any remaining cases on the inactive docket. Counsel for plaintiffs and defendant(s) are directed to provide quarterly reports as to their progress in dismissing cases on the inactive docket. The court will reinstate the case to the active docket if one of the parties shows good cause for such reinstatement. This Order is related to the Proposed Inactive Docket Order filed at ECF No. 4420 in MDL Case No. 2327 Ethicon. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 9/26/2017. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (kp) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
June 14, 2017 Filing 10 PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Karren A. Shilson. (Wilson, Kimberly) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
November 11, 2016 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Kari L. Sutherland on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Sutherland, Kari) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
April 29, 2016 Filing 8 PLAINTIFF'S PRIVILEGE LOG REGARDING PRODUCTION OF REDACTED MEDICAL RECORDS FROM PRESTON MEDICAL ASSOCIATES, P.A. by Karren A. Shilson (Wilson, Kimberly) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
January 25, 2016 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by William M. Gage on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
November 25, 2014 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christy D. Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
May 30, 2013 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED for Ethicon, LLC, Ethicon, LLC served on 5/17/2013, answer due 6/7/2013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - signed green card)(Wilson, Kimberly) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
May 24, 2013 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
April 29, 2013 Filing 3 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 45 (Preservation Order) entered on 04/25/2013 in MDL 2327 to attorneys in member case. (jap) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
April 29, 2013 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Ethicon, LLC, #2 Summons as to Johnson & Johnson) (tmh) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
April 26, 2013 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $350.00. Receipt # 0425-2378085. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cwm) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shilson v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karren A. Shilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?