BRAINSTORM XX, LLC, d/b/a www.ROBOCALLS.CASH et al v. Doe et al
Plaintiff: BRAINSTORM XX, LLC, d/b/a www.ROBOCALLS.CASH and Lee "Doc" Compton
Defendant: Jane 1-9 Does, John 1 Doe, Peter Bergman, ROBOCALLSCASH.NET, ROBOCALLSCASHKIT.COM, Josh King and John 2-9 Does
Case Number: 4:2020cv00554
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/18/2020. (rpc, )
August 18, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III: Motion Hearing held on 8/18/2020 at 9:00 a.m. re #5 Emergency MOTION re #4 Order,, Temporary Restraining Order,, Set Hearings,, Terminate Motions, #2 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Expedited Discovery and Hearing to Extend Temporary Restraining Order and Show cau filed by Lee "Doc" Compton, BRAINSTORM XX, LLC, d/b/a www.ROBOCALLS.CASH. Eric Roberson appeared on behalf of Plaintiff. No appearance on behalf of Defendant. Court will sign order. Hearing adjourned at 9:12 a.m. (Court Reporter Jan Mason) (kkc)
August 17, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by BRAINSTORM XX, LLC, d/b/a www.ROBOCALLS.CASH, Lee "Doc" Compton re #6 Order,,, Set Hearings,,, Terminate Motions,, of Proposed Preliminary Injunction Order (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Roberson, Eric)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. It is ORDERED that the existing temporary restraining order shall remain in full force and effect through the earlier of (a) the completion of the hearing on Plaintiff's request for preliminary injunction, or (b) the expiration of the fourteenth (14th) day following issuance of this Order. The hearing on Plaintiff's application for a preliminary injunction is reset for the 18th day of August 2020, at 9:00 o'clock a.m. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/4/2020. (rpc, )
August 3, 2020 Filing 5 Emergency MOTION re #4 Order,, Temporary Restraining Order,, Set Hearings,, Terminate Motions, #2 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Expedited Discovery and Hearing to Extend Temporary Restraining Order and Show cause Hearing by BRAINSTORM XX, LLC, d/b/a www.ROBOCALLS.CASH, Lee "Doc" Compton. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Roberson, Eric) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/3/2020) (rpc, ).
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that each Defendant shall appear before this Court on 8/4/2020 at 09:00 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 7/21/2020. (rpc, )
July 21, 2020 Filing 3 Emergency MOTION for Hearing re #2 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Expedited Discovery and Hearing by BRAINSTORM XX, LLC, d/b/a www.ROBOCALLS.CASH, Lee "Doc" Compton. (Roberson, Eric) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/21/2020: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (rpc, ).
July 19, 2020 Filing 2 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Expedited Discovery and Hearing by BRAINSTORM XX, LLC, d/b/a www.ROBOCALLS.CASH, Lee "Doc" Compton. (Attachments: #1 Rule 65 Certification, #2 Brief in Support of Motion, #3 Appendix, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Roberson, Eric)
July 17, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (kls, )
July 17, 2020 Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (kls, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7898870.), filed by Lee "Doc" Compton, BRAINSTORM XX, LLC, d/b/a www.ROBOCALLS.CASH.(Roberson, Eric) Modified on 7/17/2020 (rpc, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/17/2020: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (rpc, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BRAINSTORM XX, LLC, d/b/a www.ROBOCALLS.CASH et al v. Doe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRAINSTORM XX, LLC, d/b/a www.ROBOCALLS.CASH
Represented By: Eric Nelson Roberson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee "Doc" Compton
Represented By: Eric Nelson Roberson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane 1-9 Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John 1 Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Bergman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBOCALLSCASH.NET
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBOCALLSCASHKIT.COM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John 2-9 Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?