Wittorf v. Frisco Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Erika Lynn Wittorf
Defendant: Jamie "Mike&quot Gonzalez, Victor Cristales, City of Frisco, Richard Abernathy, David Shilson, Frisco Police Department, George Purefoy, Jeff Cheney, Billy Clay, Justin Hawthorne and Jamie Gonzalez
Case Number: 4:2020cv00573
Filed: July 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sean D Jordan
Referring Judge: Christine A Nowak
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Jacob Davis on behalf of Jeff Cheney, Billy Clay, Jamie Gonzalez, Justin Hawthorne, George Purefoy, David Shilson (Davis, Robert)
September 15, 2020 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed George Purefoy served on 9/2/2020, answer due 9/23/2020. (daj, )
September 15, 2020 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed David Shilson served on 9/2/2020, answer due 9/23/2020. (daj, )
September 15, 2020 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed Jamie Gonzalez served on 9/2/2020, answer due 9/23/2020. (daj, )
September 15, 2020 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed Billy Clay served on 9/2/2020, answer due 9/23/2020. (daj, )
September 15, 2020 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed Justin Hawthorne served on 9/2/2020, answer due 9/23/2020. (daj, )
September 15, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed Jeff Cheney served on 9/2/2020, answer due 9/23/2020. (daj, )
August 12, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Issued as to David Shilson, forwarded to USM for service. (daj, )
August 12, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Issued as to George Purefoy, forwarded to USM for service. (daj, )
August 12, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Issued as to Justin Hawthorne, forwarded to USM for service. (daj, )
August 12, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Issued as to Jamie Gonzalez, forwarded to USM for service. (daj, )
August 12, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Issued as to Billy Clay, forwarded to USM for service. (daj, )
August 12, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Issued as to Jeff Cheney, forwarded to USM for service. (daj, )
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff shall prepare service of process on the Defendants in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules for the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Texas within thirty (30) days of receiving this Order. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall issue process and deliver Plaintiff's Amended Complaint [Dkt. 6] to the United States Marshal for service at no cost to Plaintiff and Defendant(s) shall have thirty (30) days from the date of service of process to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 8/11/2020. (daj, )
August 9, 2020 Filing 9 Supplement to Main Document: #6 Amended Complaint. (daj, )
August 5, 2020 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Erika Lynn Wittorf as to #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (daj, )
August 4, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Erika Lynn Wittorf.(daj, )
August 3, 2020 Filing 5 ***DISREGARD ENTRY - NO SIGNATURE***AMENDED COMPLAINT against City of Frisco, Billy Clay, Frisco Police Department, Jamie "Mike" Gonzalez, David Shilson, Justine Hawthorn, Jeff Cheney, George Purefoy, filed by Erika Lynn Wittorf.(kls, ) Modified on 8/3/2020 (kls, ). Modified on 8/4/2020 (daj, ).
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 7/29/2020. (daj, )
July 27, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Erika Lynn Wittorf. (daj, )
July 27, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. **Consent form mailed to plaintiff. (daj, )
July 27, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to District Judge Sean D. Jordan and referred to Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate referral) (daj, )
July 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Erika Lynn Wittorf. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(daj, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wittorf v. Frisco Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie "Mike&quot Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Cristales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Frisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Abernathy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Shilson
Represented By: Robert Jacob Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frisco Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Purefoy
Represented By: Robert Jacob Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Cheney
Represented By: Robert Jacob Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billy Clay
Represented By: Robert Jacob Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Hawthorne
Represented By: Robert Jacob Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Gonzalez
Represented By: Robert Jacob Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erika Lynn Wittorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?