Wegner v. Tetra Pak, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Patricia Wegner
Defendant: Tetra Pak, Inc and The Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2020cv00608
Filed: August 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sean D Jordan
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 10/5/2020. (rpc, )
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 10/5/2020. (rpc, ) (Main Document 17 replaced on 10/5/2020) (rpc, ).
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ANSWER to #12 Amended Complaint by Tetra Pak, Inc.(McCall, George)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by The Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Protective Order, #2 Exhibit A to Protective Order, #3 Exhibit B to Protective Order)(Wills, Linda)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company's ANSWER to #12 Amended Complaint by The Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company.(Wills, Linda)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER. It is ORDERED that Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company's Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's State Law Claims and to Strike Jury Demand, (Dkt. #5 ), and Defendant Tetra Pak, Inc.'s Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's State Law Claims and to Strike Jury Demand, (Dkt. #6 ), are DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 9/16/2020. (rpc, )
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Tetra Pak, Inc, The Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company, filed by Patricia Wegner.(McLearen, Garrett)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/19/2020. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 11/4/2020 at 01:30 PM in Ctrm 105 (Plano) before District Judge Sean D. Jordan. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 9/10/2020. (rpc, )
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Plaintiff's deadline to respond to Defendant Tetra Pak, Inc.'s Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's State Law Claims and to Strike Jury Demand, (Dkt. #6 ), is extended to September 25, 2020. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 8/31/2020. (rpc, )
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's State Law Claims and to Strike Jury Demand by Patricia Wegner. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed Order)(McLearen, Garrett)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Plaintiff's deadline to respond to Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company's Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's State Law Claims and to Strike Jury Demand, (Dkt. #5 ), is extended to September 25, 2020. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 8/27/2020. (rpc, )
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS STATE LAW CLAIMS AND TO STRIKE JURY DEMAND by Patricia Wegner. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Extend)(McLearen, Garrett) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/26/2020) (rpc, ).
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's State Law Claims and to Strike Jury Demand by Tetra Pak, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(McCall, George)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS STATE LAW CLAIMS AND TO STRIKE JURY DEMAND by The Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Wills, Linda) (Attachment 3 replaced on 8/12/2020) (rpc, ).
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND ADVISORY. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 8/12/2020. (rpc, )
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE by The Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE OF INTERESTED PARTIES (Wills, Linda)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** COMPLAINT against Tetra Pak, Inc, The Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company, filed by Patricia Wegner.(rpc, )
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company from 362 Judicial District Court, Denton County, Texas, case number 20-5205-362. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7934368), filed by The Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit A-1, #4 Exhibit A-2, #5 Exhibit A-3, #6 Exhibit List of Attorneys, #7 Exhibit Co-Defendant's Written Consent to Removal, #8 Exhibit B)(Wills, Linda)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to District Judge Sean D. Jordan. (rpc, )
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wegner v. Tetra Pak, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tetra Pak, Inc
Represented By: George Steven McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Linda Patricia Wills
Represented By: Ved Chitale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Wegner
Represented By: Anthony Leonard Vitullo
Represented By: John L Malesovas
Represented By: Garrett J McLearen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?