OnPoint Systems, LLC v. Protect Animals With Satellites, LLC
Plaintiff: OnPoint Systems, LLC
Defendant: Protect Animals With Satellites, LLC
Not Classified By Court: David Folsom and Scott Woloson
Case Number: 4:2020cv00657
Filed: September 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 129 MOTION for Leave to File Supplement To Its Disclosures Pursuant to P.R. 3-3 by Protect Animals With Satellites, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Additional Attachment(s) Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9 (Part 1), #12 Exhibit 9 (Part 2), #13 Exhibit 9 (Part 3), #14 Exhibit 10, #15 Exhibit 11, #16 Exhibit 12, #17 Exhibit 13, #18 Exhibit 14)(Bishop, Gregory)
July 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 128 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Telephone Conference Hearing Proceedings held on 7/7/23 before Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Chris Hwang,Telephone number: 518-302-6772. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Motion to Redact due 8/3/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/11/2023. (ljw, )
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 127 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Gwendolyn Tawresey on behalf of Protect Animals With Satellites, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ATXEDC-9594964. (Tawresey, Gwendolyn)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 126 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by OnPoint Systems, LLC for proceedings held on 07/07/2023 (Telephone Conference) before Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (Everingham, Charles) (Forwarded to Chris Hwang on 7/11/2023) (ljw, ).
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III: Telephone Conference held on 7/7/2023 at 2:00 p.m. regarding discovery disputes concerning deposition timing and topics and interrogatories. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Benjamin Stern, Chad Everingham, Seth Coburn, and Timothy Shannon; Defense - Gregory Bishop and Becca Skupin. Court heard argument from parties regarding discovery issues. The Court concluded that Plaintiff is entitled to seven hours for deposition of Michael Ehrman, set for 7/11/2023, but that Plaintiff cannot revisit topics addressed in Mr. Ehrman's prior deposition. Court also overruled Defendant's objection to Topics 18, 22, 23, and 26 in Plaintiff's Second Notice of Deposition. As to Defendant's request to compel supplementation to Plaintiff's responses to Defendant's Third and Fourth Sets of Interrogatories, the Court rejected Defendant's request with respect to Interrogatories No. 21 and 22, but authorized Defendant to file letter briefing/motion to compel, with like response, regarding Interrogatory No. 18. (No exhibits) (Court Reporter Digital Recording.) (No attachment) (tls)
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference to address discovery matters set for Friday 7/7/2023 2:00 PM before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Attorneys are instructed to call the Conference Number at 1:55 PM: (571) 353-2301; Call ID: 172598549, followed by #. (No attachment) (tls)
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order The Court has been notified that the discovery issue set for Telephone Conference on June 12, 2023, has been resolved; the conference is CANCELLED. (No attachment) (tls)
June 9, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference to address a discovery matter set for Monday 6/12/2023 3:00 PM before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Attorneys are instructed to call the Conference Number at 2:55 PM: (571) 353-2301; Call ID: 172598549, followed by #. (No attachment) (tls)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER Granting in Part #120 Motion Lift Stay and Enter Scheduling Order. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 06/06/2023. (klc, )
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Pretrial Conference set for 1/30/2024 09:00 AM before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III.(klc, )
April 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 124 NOTICE by OnPoint Systems, LLC re #120 MOTION Lift Stay and Enter Scheduling Order (PARTIALLY OPPOSED) NOTICE OF NO REPLY RELATED TO MOTION (Stern, Benjamin)
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 123 REDACTED RESPONSE in Opposition re #120 MOTION Lift Stay and Enter Scheduling Order (PARTIALLY OPPOSED) REDACTED VERSION filed by Protect Animals With Satellites, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bishop, Gregory)
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 122 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #120 MOTION Lift Stay and Enter Scheduling Order (PARTIALLY OPPOSED) filed by Protect Animals With Satellites, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bishop, Gregory)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that the stay in this case, which the Court entered on July 12, 2022 (Dkt. #115), shall be LIFTED. Defendant shall file a response to Plaintiff's Motion to Enter Scheduling Order (Dkt. #120 ) and its own proposed scheduling order no later than April 11, 2023. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/4/2023. (baf, )
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 120 MOTION Lift Stay and Enter Scheduling Order (PARTIALLY OPPOSED) by OnPoint Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Stern, Benjamin)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER. On July 12, 2022, the Court granted Plaintiff's Motion to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review (Dkts. #102, #115). It is hereby ORDERED that the Clerk shall ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this case pending final resolution of the Patent Trial and Appeal Board's inter partes review of United States Patents No. 9,848,295, No. 9,922,522, and No. 9,924,314. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/23/2023. (baf, )
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 118 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9-23-2022 before Judge Mazzant. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Christina Bickham,Telephone number: 903-209-4013. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Motion to Redact due 10/24/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/1/2023. (Bickham, Chris)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 117 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by OnPoint Systems, LLC for proceedings held on 9/23/2022 Telephone Conference before Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (Everingham, Charles) (Main Document 117 replaced with flattened version on 9/23/2022) (Forwarded to Chris Bickham on 9/23/22)(ljw, ).
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III: Telephone Conference held on 9/23/2022 regarding discovery disputes. Benjamin Stern, Charles Everingham, IV, Seth Coburn and Timothy Shannon appeared on behalf of Plaintiff. Greg Bishop, Haden Marrs, Michael Smith and Becca Skupin appeared on behalf of Defendant. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (kkc, )
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference to address a discovery dispute set for Friday 9/23/2022 11:30 AM before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Attorneys may call the Conference Number at 11:25 AM: 888-363-4749; Access Code: 1588844, followed by #. (tls)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER. It is therefore ORDERED that OnPoint System, LLC's Motion to Extend Certain Case Deadlines Until Court's Ruling on Pending Motion to Stay (Dkt. #114 ) is denied as moot. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/11/2022. (baf, )
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER- It is ORDERED that this action is ADMINISTRATIVELY STAYED pending final resolution of the Patent Trial and Appeal Boards inter partes review of United States PatentsNo. 9,848,295, No. 9,922,522, and No. 9,924,314.. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 07/12/2022. (klc, ) Modified on 7/12/2022 (klc, ).
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Case ADMINISTRATIVELY Stayed (klc, )
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MOTION to Extend Certain Case Deadlines Until the Court's Ruling on Pending Motion to Stay by OnPoint Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Stern, Benjamin)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER - granting #112 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Oscar A Figueroa terminated. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 7/11/2022. (baf, )
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 112 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Protect Animals With Satellites, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bishop, Gregory)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 111 NOTICE by OnPoint Systems, LLC re #102 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review Notice of Subsequent Related Proceedings (Stern, Benjamin)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 110 NOTICE by OnPoint Systems, LLC re #83 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Leave to Supplement its Infringement Disclosures Pursuant to P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Stern, Benjamin)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 109 RESPONSE in Opposition re #102 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review (REDACTED) filed by Protect Animals With Satellites, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Gregory S. Bishop, #2 Exhibit 1 - REDACTED, #3 Exhibit 2 - REDACTED, #4 Exhibit 3 - REDACTED, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8)(Bishop, Gregory)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 108 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #102 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review filed by Protect Animals With Satellites, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Gregory S. Bishop, #2 Exhibit 1 - CONFIDENTIAL, #3 Exhibit 2 - CONFIDENTIAL, #4 Exhibit 3 - CONFIDENTIAL, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8)(Bishop, Gregory)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 107 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #96 SEALED MOTION To Compel Documents Regarding Cesar Millan filed by Protect Animals With Satellites, LLC. (Bishop, Gregory)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 106 REDACTION to #105 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion to Compel Documents Regarding Cesar Millan by OnPoint Systems, LLC. (Stern, Benjamin)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 105 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #96 SEALED MOTION To Compel Documents Regarding Cesar Millan filed by OnPoint Systems, LLC. (Stern, Benjamin)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER - granting #103 Motion to Expedite Briefing. It is therefore ORDERED that any response from the Defendant to Plaintiff's Motion to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review shall be filed by Wednesday, June 1, 2022. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 5/24/2022. (baf, )
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 103 Unopposed MOTION to Expedite Briefing on OPS's Motion to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review by OnPoint Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stern, Benjamin)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 102 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review by OnPoint Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stern, Benjamin)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER. The Court hereby ORDERS the parties to appropriately divide and pay $28,642.50 to the Law Office of Scott Woloson, P.C., 1431 Wirt Road #141, Houston, TX 77055 [Account No. 12.0009] within thirty (30) days from the entry of this Order. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 5/20/2022. (baf, )
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 100 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 5/20/2022. (baf, )
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 99 RESPONSE in Opposition re #96 SEALED MOTION To Compel Documents Regarding Cesar Millan filed by Protect Animals With Satellites, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Gregory S. Bishop, #2 Exhibit 1 - REDACTED, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Bishop, Gregory)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 98 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #96 SEALED MOTION To Compel Documents Regarding Cesar Millan filed by Protect Animals With Satellites, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Gregory S. Bishop, #2 Exhibit 1 - CONFIDENTIAL, Under Seal, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Bishop, Gregory)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 97 REDACTION to #96 SEALED MOTION To Compel Documents Regarding Cesar Millan by OnPoint Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Stern, Benjamin)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 96 SEALED MOTION To Compel Documents Regarding Cesar Millan by OnPoint Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Stern, Benjamin)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 95 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Claim Construction Hearing held on 3/28/2022 before Judge Mazzant. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Christina Bickham,Telephone number: 903-209-4013.
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 94 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #83 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Leave to Supplement its Infringement Disclosures Pursuant to P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 (REDACTED VERSION) filed by Protect Animals With Satellites, LLC. (Marrs, Haden)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 93 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #83 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Leave to Supplement its Infringement Disclosures Pursuant to P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 filed by Protect Animals With Satellites, LLC. (Marrs, Haden)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 92 REDACTION to #90 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion for Leave to Supplement its Infringement Disclosures Pursuant to P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 by OnPoint Systems, LLC. (Stern, Benjamin)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 91 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Protect Animals With Satellites, LLC for proceedings held on 3/28/2022 before Judge Hon. Amos L. Mazzant, III. (Bishop, Gregory) (Forwarded to Chris Bickham on 4/8/2022) (ljw, ).
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 90 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #83 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Leave to Supplement its Infringement Disclosures Pursuant to P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 filed by OnPoint Systems, LLC. (Stern, Benjamin)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 89 REDACTED TRANSCRIPT - Reporter's Transcript of Teleconference 2/14/2022. (kls, )
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 88 RESPONSE in Opposition re #83 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Leave to Supplement its Infringement Disclosures Pursuant to P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 - REDACTED VERSION filed by Protect Animals With Satellites, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Gregory S. Bishop - Redacted Version, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3 - REDACTED, #5 Exhibit 4 - REDACTED, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6 - REDACTED, #8 Exhibit 7 - REDACTED, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10 - REDACTED, #12 Exhibit 11 - REDACTED, #13 Exhibit 12 - REDACTED ENTIRELY, #14 Text of Proposed Order REDACTED)(Bishop, Gregory)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 87 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #83 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Leave to Supplement its Infringement Disclosures Pursuant to P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 filed by Protect Animals With Satellites, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Gregory S. Bishop, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Text of Proposed Order)(Bishop, Gregory)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III: Markman Hearing held on 3/28/2022. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (kkc, )
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 86 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrea Leigh Fair on behalf of OnPoint Systems, LLC (Fair, Andrea)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER - granting #81 Motion to Redact re #77 Transcript. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 3/22/2022. (baf, )
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 84 REDACTION to #83 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Leave to Supplement its Infringement Disclosures Pursuant to P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 by OnPoint Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 1-A, #3 Exhibit 1-B, #4 Exhibit 1-C, #5 Exhibit 1-D, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit 5, #10 Exhibit 6, #11 Exhibit 7, #12 Exhibit 8, #13 Exhibit 9, #14 Exhibit 10, #15 Exhibit 11, #16 Exhibit 12, #17 Exhibit 13, #18 Exhibit 14, #19 Exhibit 15, #20 Exhibit 16)(Stern, Benjamin)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order The Parties are hereby notified that the Court will hold the March 28, 2022, 9:00 a.m. Markman hearing via video. The Court will email instructions to Counsel. (tls)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 83 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Leave to Supplement its Infringement Disclosures Pursuant to P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 by OnPoint Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 1-A, #3 Exhibit 1-B, #4 Exhibit 1-C, #5 Exhibit 1-D, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit 5, #10 Exhibit 6, #11 Exhibit 7, #12 Exhibit 8, #13 Exhibit 9, #14 Exhibit 10, #15 Exhibit 11, #16 Exhibit 12, #17 Exhibit 13, #18 Exhibit 14, #19 Exhibit 15, #20 Exhibit 16, #21 Text of Proposed Order)(Stern, Benjamin)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 82 NOTICE by Protect Animals With Satellites, LLC re #73 Reply to Claim Construction Brief Of Additional Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bishop, Gregory)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MOTION to Redact #77 Transcript,,, by Protect Animals With Satellites, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Transcript (Redacted Version), #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bishop, Gregory)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 80 NOTICE of Intent to Request Redaction by Gregory Scott Bishop re #77 Transcript,,,. (Bishop, Gregory)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 79 Joint Claim Construction Chart by OnPoint Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Joint Chart))(Stern, Benjamin)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 78 NOTICE by OnPoint Systems, LLC of Compliance (Technology Tutorial) (Stern, Benjamin)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 77 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Telephone Conference held on 2/14/2022 before Judge Mazzant. Court Reporter: Christina Bickham,Telephone number: 903-209-4013.
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 76 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anna Rebecca Skupin on behalf of Protect Animals With Satellites, LLC (Skupin, Anna)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 75 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by OnPoint Systems, LLC for proceedings held on 2/14/2022 Telephonic Hearing before Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. (Everingham, Charles) (Forwarded to Chris Bickham on 2/14/2022) (ljw, ).
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III: Telephone conference held on 2/14/2022 at 10:01 a.m. Benjamin Stern, Charles Everingham IV, and Stanley Coburn appeared on behalf of Plaintiff. Gregory Bishop and Haden Marrs appeared on behalf of Defendants. After hearing argument from counsel regarding the discovery issues, the Court denies Defendants' request to force Plaintiff to answer interrogatory regarding feasibility and finds it be premature, but the Court requests Plaintiff respond to the letter. The parties will meet and confer today regarding the response deadline for that letter. As to interrogatory number 2, the Plaintiff is ordered to respond by 3/14/2022. The Court does not order production as being relevant for apportionment but Plaintiff may file motion to compel and provide further detail. As to the final issue raised by the Parties, the Court finds that the information from Softeq is relevant and discoverable so defense should go back to Softeq and see if there are documents that need to be produced. Call adjourned at 11:00 a.m. (Court Reporter Christine Bickham.) (kkc, )
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference to address a discovery dispute set for Monday 2/14/2022 10:00 AM before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Attorneys are instructed to call the Conference Number at 9:55 AM: 888-363-4749; Access Code: 1588844, followed by #. (tls)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER APPOINTING TECHNICAL ADVISOR. Scott Woloson appointed as technical advisor. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 2/7/2022. (baf, )
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 73 REPLY to #67 Claim Construction Brief,, filed by OnPoint Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Stern, Benjamin)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 72 NOTICE by Protect Animals With Satellites, LLC re #71 Reply to Claim Construction Brief, OF CORRECTION TO EXHIBIT C (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Corrected - C)(Bishop, Gregory)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 71 REPLY to #67 Claim Construction Brief,, filed by Protect Animals With Satellites, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Part 1, #2 Exhibit A - Part 2, #3 Exhibit A - Part 3, #4 Exhibit A - Part 4, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E)(Bishop, Gregory)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 70 REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: unsuccessful(Folsom, David)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting #68 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limits for Claim Construction Briefing. It is therefore ORDERED that Plaintiff is permitted 40 pages for its opening claim construction brief and 15 pages for its reply claim construction brief. It is further ORDERED that Defendant is permitted 40 pages for its response claim construction brief. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/19/2022. (baf, )
January 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Joint MOTION for Leave to File /Exceed Page Limits for Claim Construction Briefing by OnPoint Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Everingham, Charles)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 67 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by OnPoint Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit U.S. Patent No. 9,848,295, #2 Exhibit U.S. Patent No. 9,538,329, #3 Exhibit U.S. Patent No. 9,922,522, #4 Exhibit U.S. Patent No. 9,924,314, #5 Exhibit Declaration of David L. Armitage in Support of OPS's Proposed Claim Constructions, #6 Exhibit Ex. A. to Armitage Declaration, #7 Exhibit Ex. B to Armitage Declaration, #8 Exhibit Ex. C to Armitage Declaration, #9 Exhibit PAWS's Second Amended Invalidity Contentions, #10 Exhibit PAWS's Proposed Constructions for Exchanged Terms)(Stern, Benjamin)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement by OnPoint Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Joint Chart))(Stern, Benjamin)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER SETTING TRIAL. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/4/2023 at 9:00 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Jury Selection/Trial set for 1/30/2023 at 10:00 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 11/19/2021. (baf, )
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Plaintiff's ANSWER to #61 Answer to Amended Complaint,,, Counterclaim,, by OnPoint Systems, LLC.(Stern, Benjamin)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER - granting #62 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #23 Scheduling Order, Terminate Motions, filed by OnPoint Systems, LLC. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/4/2023 at 9:00 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Fact Discovery Deadline 6/1/2022. Proposed Jury instructions/Form of Verdict due by 12/21/2022. Mediation with Judge Folsom by 12/17/2021. Dispositive motions and any other motions that may require a hearing due by 8/17/2022. Joint Final Pretrial Order due by 12/7/2022. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/4/2023 09:00 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Claim Construction Hearing set for 3/28/2022 at 9:00 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/19/2021. (baf, )
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #23 Scheduling Order,,,, Terminate Motions,,, by OnPoint Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Stern, Benjamin)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Defendant Protect Animals with Satellites LLC ANSWER to #43 Amended Complaint SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, COUNTERCLAIM AND THIRD AMENDED COUNTERCLAIMS against OnPoint Systems, LLC by Protect Animals With Satellites, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I)(Crockett, Craig)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Stern, Benjamin)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Plaintiff's Motion for Status Conference is DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 7/28/2021. (baf, )
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. It is therefore ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint (Dkt. #42 ) is hereby GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 7/26/2021. (baf, )
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement by OnPoint Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Stern, Benjamin)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #42 SEALED MOTION For Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Protect Animals With Satellites, LLC. (Crockett, Craig)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 REDACTION to #54 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion For Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by OnPoint Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Stern, Benjamin)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #42 SEALED MOTION For Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by OnPoint Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Stern, Benjamin)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 RESPONSE in Opposition re #46 MOTION Status Conference filed by Protect Animals With Satellites, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Crockett, Craig)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER - granting #51 Joint MOTION For Extension of Mediation Deadline filed by OnPoint Systems, LLC., Mediation Completion due by 10/15/2021. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 6/30/2021. (baf, )
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Joint MOTION For Extension of Mediation Deadline by OnPoint Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stern, Benjamin)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #47 Joint Motion for Expedited Briefing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Status Conference. ORDERED that Defendant Protect Animals with Satellites, LLC shall have until and including July 1, 2021, to file its response in opposition to Plaintiff OnPoint Systems, LLC's Motion for Status Conference (Dkt. #46). Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 6/28/2021. (kls, )
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order courtesy copies; therefore, Counsel are asked to comply with Local Rule CV-5(a)(9) and Local Rule CV-10(b) with respect to sending courtesy copies to Judge Mazzant. Please send copies of filings that exceed 20 pages to Judge Mazzant's chambers. Please use tabs and dividers for exhibits, and please place very voluminous filings in three-ring binder(s). Staples are fine; no binder clips, please. (tls)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 REPLY to Response to Motion re #42 SEALED MOTION For Leave to File Second Amended Complaint Declaration of Craig Crockett in Support of PAWS' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Protect Animals With Satellites, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Craig Crockett in Support of PAWS Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Craig Crockett in Support of PAWS Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Craig Crockett in Support of PAWS Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint)(Crockett, Craig)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 RESPONSE in Opposition re #42 SEALED MOTION For Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Protect Animals With Satellites, LLC. (Crockett, Craig)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Joint MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Plaintiff's Motion for Status Conference [Dkt. No. 46] by OnPoint Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stern, Benjamin)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MOTION Status Conference by OnPoint Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Stern, Benjamin)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ANSWER to #40 Amended Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, (Second Amended) by OnPoint Systems, LLC.(Stern, Benjamin)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 REDACTION to #42 SEALED MOTION For Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by OnPoint Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Redline Proposed Second Amended Complaint), #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Stern, Benjamin)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second) against Protect Animals With Satellites, LLC, filed by OnPoint Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 4)(Stern, Benjamin)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 SEALED MOTION For Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by OnPoint Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Redline Proposed Second Amended Complaint), #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Stern, Benjamin)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER - granting #39 Motion for Leave to File Amended answer to First Amended Complaint and Second Amended Counterclaim. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 6/9/2021. (baf, )
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 AMENDED ANSWER to #20 Amended Complaint and, Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Protect Animals With Satellites, LLC by Protect Animals With Satellites, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Crockett, Craig)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer to First Amended Complaint and Second Amended Counterclaims by Protect Animals With Satellites, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Crockett, Craig)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by James E. Schutz on behalf of All Defendants. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8444930. (Schutz, James)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE by Protect Animals With Satellites, LLC of Compliance Regarding Privilege Log (Crockett, Craig)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER REGARDING ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 5/7/2021. (baf, )
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 5/7/2021. (baf, )
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Joint MOTION Entry of Protective Order and ESI Order by OnPoint Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Protective Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed ESI Order)(Stern, Benjamin)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ANSWER to #28 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by OnPoint Systems, LLC.(Stern, Benjamin)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Stern, Benjamin)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER - granting #27 Motion for Leave to Amend Counterclaims. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/22/2021. (baf, )
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Oscar A Figueroa on behalf of Protect Animals With Satellites, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8373531. (Figueroa, Oscar)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory Scott Bishop on behalf of Protect Animals With Satellites, LLC (Bishop, Gregory)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 AMENDED ANSWER to #20 Amended Complaint and, Amended COUNTERCLAIM against OnPoint Systems, LLC by Protect Animals With Satellites, LLC. (Crockett, Craig)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Counterclaims by Protect Animals With Satellites, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Crockett, Craig)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Charles Smith on behalf of Protect Animals With Satellites, LLC (Smith, Michael)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Resetting of Hearing: By agreement of the Court and the Parties, the Markman Hearing is hereby RESET for Monday 11/15/2021 at 9:00 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. (No attachment.) (tls)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION. The Court hereby ORDERS that this case be submitted to mediation in accordance with this court's Mediation Plan. The mediator assigned is the Hon. David Folsom (Ret.). Mediation Completion due by 7/16/2021. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/15/2021. (baf, )
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE by OnPoint Systems, LLC of Compliance (Amended P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 Disclosures) (Stern, Benjamin)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PATENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/25/2022 at 9:00 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Final Amended Pleadings due by 6/11/2021 (A motion for leave is required). Fact Discovery Deadline 1/20/2022. Expert Discovery Deadline 3/24/2022. Joinder of Parties due by 6/11/2021. Jury instructions due by 8/11/2022. Mediation Completion due by 7/16/2021. Claim construction Hearing set for 11/12/2021 at 9:00 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Dispositive motions and any other motions that may require a hearing due by 4/7/2022. File Daubert motion or any other objections to experts 4/7/2022. Joint Final Pretrial Order due by 7/26/2022. GRANTING #22 Joint MOTION Entry of Scheduling Order filed by OnPoint Systems, LLC. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/13/2021. (baf, )
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Joint MOTION Entry of Scheduling Order by OnPoint Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stern, Benjamin)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER - granting #19 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. It is therefore ORDERED that the First Amended Complaint (Dkt. #20 ) is deemed filed. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/7/2021. (baf, )
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT (First Amended) against Protect Animals With Satellites, LLC, filed by OnPoint Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Stern, Benjamin)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by OnPoint Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Stern, Benjamin)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT submitted DOCUMENT #18 - DOCUMENT IS NOT FILED IN COMPLIANCE WITH OUR LOCAL RULE CV-7(k) AND PROPOSED ORDER DOES NOT COMPLY WITH OUR LOCAL RULE CV-7(a). Correction should be made by ONE BUSINESS DAY (baf, )
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - PLEASE DISREGARD***Joint MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint and First Amended Counterclaims by OnPoint Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Redline Proposed Amended Complaint), #2 Exhibit 2 (Redline Proposed Amended Counterclaims), #3 Exhibit 3 (Proposed Order))(Stern, Benjamin) Modified on 4/6/2021 (baf, ).
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE by OnPoint Systems, LLC of Compliance (P.R. 3-1 and 3-2) (Stern, Benjamin)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Haden R Marrs on behalf of Protect Animals With Satellites, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8302318. (Marrs, Haden)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Everingham, IV on behalf of OnPoint Systems, LLC (Everingham, Charles)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Due to the Court's civil trial docket, the 3/8/2021 Scheduling Conference is CANCELLED. The Court will enter a Scheduling Order. (tls)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Proposed Deadlines), #2 Exhibit B (Proposed Order Regarding Electronically Stored Information), #3 Exhibit C (Proposed Protective Order))(Stern, Benjamin)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Craig C. Crockett on behalf of Protect Animals With Satellites, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8252456. (Crockett, Craig)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. The case is SET for the Initial Rule 16 Management Conference son Monday, 3/8/2021, at 9:00 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 12/28/2020. (baf, )
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ANSWER to #9 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by OnPoint Systems, LLC.(Stern, Benjamin)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Protect Animals With Satellites, LLC (Siebman, Clyde)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against OnPoint Systems, LLC by Protect Animals With Satellites, LLC.(Siebman, Clyde)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Protect Animals With Satellites, LLC.( Siebman, Clyde)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Protect Animals With Satellites, LLC to 10/23/2020. 29 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( baf, )
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by OnPoint Systems, LLC. Protect Animals With Satellites, LLC served on 9/3/2020, answer due 9/24/2020. (Coburn, Seth)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued as to Protect Animals With Satellites, LLC. (baf, )
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Benjamin M Stern on behalf of OnPoint Systems, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7981147. (saenz, )
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (baf, )
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Seth Stanley Coburn on behalf of OnPoint Systems, LLC (Coburn, Seth)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Shannon, Timothy)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by OnPoint Systems, LLC (Shannon, Timothy)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Protect Animals With Satellites, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7978541.), filed by OnPoint Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-'295 Patent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shannon, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OnPoint Systems, LLC v. Protect Animals With Satellites, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Protect Animals With Satellites, LLC
Represented By: Clyde Moody Siebman
Represented By: Craig C. Crockett
Represented By: Gregory Scott Bishop
Represented By: Anna Rebecca Skupin
Represented By: Gwendolyn Tawresey
Represented By: Haden R Marrs
Represented By: James E. Schutz
Represented By: Michael Charles Smith
Represented By: Oscar A Figueroa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OnPoint Systems, LLC
Represented By: Seth Stanley Coburn
Represented By: Timothy R Shannon
Represented By: Benjamin M Stern
Represented By: Andrea Leigh Fair
Represented By: Charles Everingham, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: David Folsom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Scott Woloson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?