Cunningham v. Concentrix Solutions Corporation
Plaintiff: Mark B. Cunningham
Defendant: Concentrix Solutions Corporation and Concentrix Corporation
Case Number: 4:2020cv00661
Filed: September 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/13/2020. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 11/30/2020 at 04:00 PM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/13/2020. (rpc, )
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Tessa L Castner on behalf of Concentrix Solutions Corporation. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8034945. (Castner, Tessa)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Concentrix Solutions Corporation identifying Corporate Parent SYNNEX CORPORATION for Concentrix Solutions Corporation. (Guy, Thomas)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Concentrix Solutions Corporation.(Guy, Thomas)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark B. Cunningham. Concentrix Solutions Corporation served on 9/10/2020, answer due 10/1/2020. (Ramon, Jaime)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Concentrix Solutions Corporation. (rpc, )
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number TXE100020782 (tkd, )
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Concentrix Solutions Corporation, filed by Mark B. Cunningham. (Attachments: #1 Exhiibt 1 - Vacancy Announcement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Text Message, #3 Exhibit 3 - Severence Agreement, #4 Exhibit 4 - Text Message, #5 Exhibit 5 - Charge of Discrimination, #6 Exhibit 6 - Notice of Right to Sue, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(baf, )
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (baf, )
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cunningham v. Concentrix Solutions Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Concentrix Solutions Corporation
Represented By: Fred Gaona, III
Represented By: Tessa L Castner
Represented By: Thomas Ray Guy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Concentrix Corporation
Represented By: Fred Gaona, III
Represented By: Tessa L Castner
Represented By: Thomas Ray Guy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark B. Cunningham
Represented By: Jaime Ramon
Represented By: Nathan M Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?