Hinojosa v. Trans Union, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Danielle Hinojosa
Defendant: Pioneer Credit, Trans Union, LLC, American Honda Finance Corp. and American Honda Finance Corporation
Case Number: 4:2020cv00772
Filed: October 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2020 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Pioneer Credit to 12/21/2020. 21 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( rpc, )
November 30, 2020 Filing 8 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Pioneer Credit.( Manley, Reid)
November 30, 2020 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Trans Union, LLC to 12/14/2020. 14 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( rpc, )
November 30, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Trans Union, LLC identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion, Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Trans Union, LLC. (Sheldon, Paul)
November 30, 2020 Filing 6 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Trans Union, LLC.( Sheldon, Paul)
November 25, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by American Honda Finance Corporation.(Stewart, Amy)
October 28, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to Pioneer Credit. (rpc, )
October 28, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to American Honda Finance Corporation. (rpc, )
October 28, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Trans Union, LLC. (rpc, )
October 8, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
October 8, 2020 Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, )
October 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-8045436.), filed by Danielle Hinojosa. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Trans Union Report Dated 10/08/2018)(Stein, Peyton)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hinojosa v. Trans Union, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pioneer Credit
Represented By: Reid Stephens Manley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Paul W Sheldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Honda Finance Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Honda Finance Corporation
Represented By: Amy M Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Hinojosa
Represented By: Peyton Lynette Stein
Represented By: Dennis Dean McCarty
Represented By: Jonathan Forrest Raburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?